BALESTRIERI v. USA
Plaintiff: |
JOHN BALESTRIERI |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv00886 |
Filed: |
December 29, 2010 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Francis M. Allegra |
Nature of Suit: |
Civilian Pay, Back Pay |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 2, 2013 |
Filing
25
STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 1/29/2014, and every 63 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
September 4, 2013 |
Filing
23
ORDER STAYING CASE: Joint Status Report due by 11/27/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
November 28, 2012 |
Filing
20
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Oral Argument set for 12/14/2012 at 10:00 AM (EST) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
April 20, 2012 |
Filing
14
SCHEDULING ORDER:Brief due by 5/18/2012. Cross Motions due by 6/15/2012. Reply due by 7/13/2012. Response due by 7/27/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
June 20, 2011 |
Filing
10
DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery completed by 12/1/2011. Expert Discovery completed by 3/30/2112. Joint Status Report due by 4/17/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties. (Modified on 6/20/2011 - corrected order text(jt1).
|
June 7, 2011 |
Filing
9
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order. Preliminary Status Conference set for 6/17/2011 at 4:00 PM (EDT) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
January 11, 2011 |
Filing
5
SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?