BEHRENS v. USA
Plaintiff: |
NINA K. BEHRENS |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv00072 |
Filed: |
February 3, 2011 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Francis M. Allegra |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 27, 2011 |
Filing
19
ORDER granting 17 Motion to Stay; granting 17 Motion for Referral to ADR. The Clerk shall assign the instant case to a settlement judge. Joint Status Report due by 1/26/2012, with subsequent reports filed every 91 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
September 26, 2011 |
Filing
15
STATUS REPORT ORDER. Defendant shall file a status report on 10/18/2011 and 28 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
September 12, 2011 |
Filing
14
STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/20/2011 at 2:30 PM (EDT) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
August 10, 2011 |
Filing
11
SCHEDULING ORDER:Defendant shall file a status report by 9/3/2011. Response due by 9/9/2011. Fact Discovery completed by 2/10/2012. Joint Status Report due by 2/24/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
July 26, 2011 |
Filing
10
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order. Preliminary Status Conference set for 8/10/2011 at 10:00 AM (EDT)in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
March 23, 2011 |
Filing
7
ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time. Response due by 6/3/2011. No further enlargements of time will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
February 17, 2011 |
Filing
5
SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?