HALLMARK-PHOENIX 3, LLC v. USA
Plaintiff: |
HALLMARK-PHOENIX 3, LLC |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv00098 |
Filed: |
February 16, 2011 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Francis M. Allegra |
Nature of Suit: |
Negotiable Instrument |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 25, 2011 |
Filing
47
ERRATA: Opinion filed on May 24, 2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
May 24, 2011 |
Filing
46
PUBLISHED OPINION re: 41 Opinion filed under sealed. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
May 2, 2011 |
Filing
37
SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant shall file its response to plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction by 5/6/2011. Plaintiff shall file its reply to defendant's response by 5/12/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
April 15, 2011 |
Filing
29
ORDER re: 27 plaintiff filed a motion for preliminary injunction. Plaintiff shall file a statement with the court explaining whether that is still its understanding or whether, instead, its filing of a motion for preliminary injunction reflects either changed circumstances or, at least, a change in its position regarding how this case should proceed. Notice of Compliance due by 4/18/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
April 8, 2011 |
Filing
26
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion. Oral Argument set for 4/28/2011 at 2:00 PM (EDT) via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
March 7, 2011 |
Filing
20
ORDER granting 18 Motion to Amend Schedule. Administrative Record on CD-ROM due by 3/15/2011; Response to motion to dismiss due by 3/29/2011; Reply to motion to dismiss due by 4/5/2011. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)Copy to parties.
|
February 24, 2011 |
Filing
15
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
|
February 16, 2011 |
Filing
7
STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/18/2011 at 2:00 PM (EST) telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?