CONFIDENTIAL INFORMANT 59-05071 v. USA

Plaintiff: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMANT 59-05071
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2011cv00153
Filed: March 10, 2011
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Emily C. Hewitt
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2017 230 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORTED OPINION Redacted Opinion and Order granting 176 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Counts I and II; granting 176 Motion to Dismiss as to Count III; denying [188-1] Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 199 Motion for Judicial Notice; granting 207 Motion for Leave from Protective Order; granting-in-part and denying-in-part 210 Motion for Judicial Notice and Relief Pursuant to RCFC 56(d). Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bh) Copy to parties.
July 21, 2016 175 Opinion or Order of the Court Reissuance of Opinion and Order Filed Under Seal 6/21/2016. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (kb) Copy to parties.
April 22, 2015 117 Opinion or Order of the Court REDACTED REPORTED OPINION: The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Status Report due by 5/15/2015. Close of discovery to be completed by 8/7/2015. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (cr) Copy to parties.
December 21, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court REDACTED PUBLISHED OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (lo) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMANT 59-05071 v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMANT 59-05071
Represented By: Thomas Scott Tufts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Jonathan Reid Prouty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?