MENDEZ v. USA
Plaintiff: |
LAWRENCE MENDEZ, JR. |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv00160 |
Filed: |
March 14, 2011 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Christine O.C. Miller |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 18, 2014 |
Filing
35
UNREPORTED OPINION and ORDER denying 34 Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a). Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (vro) Copy to parties.
|
December 20, 2012 |
Filing
26
PUBLISHED OPINION -Granting defendant's cross-motion for judgment on the administrative record and denying plaintiff's cross-motion. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for defendant. No costs. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg) Copy to parties.
|
January 31, 2012 |
Filing
18
PUBLISHED OPINION - Denying defendant's 9 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) or for Judgment on the Administrative Record; granting plaintiff's cross-motion 11 for judgment on the administrative record in part. This case is remanded for a period of 90 days or until Apr. 30, 2012, to the Board for Correction of Naval Records. On before that date the Department of the Navy shall file with the Clerk of the Court a copy of its final decision or notice of other action. RCFC 52.2(e). Upon the filing of such notice the parties shall file a Joint Status Report by that date re RCFC 52.2(f). Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?