LUCIANO v. USA
Plaintiff: |
ROBERT A. LUCIANO, JR. |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv00439 |
Filed: |
July 5, 2011 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Lawrence S. Margolis |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 4, 2015 |
Filing
114
REPORTED OPINION granting 107 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (lae) Copy to parties.
|
March 21, 2012 |
Filing
19
DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER:Discovery due by 10/12/2012. Status Report due by 10/26/2012 Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (ss) Copy to parties.
|
February 24, 2012 |
Filing
14
ORDER denying 7 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) and (6). Parties shall file joint discovery schedule by 3/1/12. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. (ss) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?