GROSS v. USA
Plaintiff: |
ALAN GROSS |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv00715 |
Filed: |
October 28, 2011 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Margaret M. Sweeney |
Nature of Suit: |
Civilian Pay, Back Pay |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 29, 2021 |
Filing
221
UNREPORTED ORDER approving the parties' final 218 settlement agreement with addenda and attachments. The date of this order, June 29, 2021, shall be the date from which all deadlines included in the amended partial settlement agreement are ca lculated. Absent the filing of a joint motion for voluntary dismissal, on or before 8/6/2021, the parties are directed to FILE a joint status report informing the court of whether any further proceedings are necessary before this case is closed. Signed by Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (TQ) Service on parties made.
|
October 31, 2016 |
Filing
76
REPORTED OPINION (Status Report due by 12/5/2016) granting 43 Motion to Certify Class; granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 48 Motion to Dismiss; denying 50 Cross Motion.. Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (MEH) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?