ARRIVALSTAR S.A. et al v. USA
Plaintiff: |
MELVINO TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED and ARRIVALSTAR S.A. |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv00784 |
Filed: |
November 22, 2011 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Francis M. Allegra |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 4, 2013 |
Filing
30
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The parties shall file opening briefs no more than 60 pages in length. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
August 20, 2012 |
Filing
26
PUBLISHED ORDER: Amended E-Discovery Order re: 22 E-Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
August 16, 2012 |
Filing
25
DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs shall serve on defendant its Claim Chart and its Proposed Claim Construction Statement" due by 10/9/2012. defendant shall serve on plaintiffs its Response Chart and its Response to Pr oposed Claim Construction Statement" due by 11/13/2012. The parties shall meet and confer and thereafter file a Joint Claim Construction Statement due by 12/7/2012. The parties shall file opening briefs on claim construction due by 1/8/2013. The parties shall file briefs in response to the opening claim construction briefs due by 2/5/2013. Fact Discovery completed by 5/21/2013. Expert Discovery completed by 8/20/2013. Joint Status Report due by 9/4/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
July 17, 2012 |
Filing
22
PUBLISHED ORDER re: 20 E-discovery management. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
June 8, 2012 |
Filing
19
SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall file a joint motion proposing an order governing the use of electronic discovery and a protective order due by 7/9/2012. The parties shall have a meeting of counsel to discuss issues relating to their preparation of claim charts due by 8/10/12. Plaintiffs shall serve on defendant its Claim Chart and its Proposed Claim Construction Statement due by 8/24/12. Defendant shall serve on plaintiffs its Response Chart and its Response to Proposed Claim Construction Statement due by 9/28/12. The parties shall meet and confer and thereafter file a "Joint Claim Construction Statement" due by 10/22/12.Opening Briefs due by 11/16/2012. Response due by 12/14/2012. Fact Discovery due by 3/29/2013. Expert Discovery due by 6/28/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
May 18, 2012 |
Filing
18
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order Preliminary Status Conference set for 6/7/2012 at 2:00 PM (EDT) in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
March 14, 2012 |
Filing
13
ORDER granting 12 Motion to Notify Interested Party. The Clerk is directed to issue notices as specified in RCFC 14(b)(3) to defendant for service upon Motorola Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
January 17, 2012 |
Filing
11
ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Response due 3/23/2012. No further enlargement of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
January 6, 2012 |
Filing
9
SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?