ADVANCED AEROSPACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., v. USA
Plaintiff: |
ADVANCED AEROSPACE TECHNOLOGIES, INC., |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00085 |
Filed: |
February 8, 2012 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan G. Braden |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 4, 2017 |
Filing
193
REPORTED Order The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Susan G. Braden. (pt) Copy to parties.
|
February 15, 2017 |
Filing
166
REPORTED OPINION granting 154 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b). Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (pt) Copy to parties.
|
November 30, 2016 |
Filing
148
REPORTED ORDER denying 134 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1). Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (rgh) Copy to parties.
|
March 11, 2016 |
Filing
131
REPORTED OPINION denying 112 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b); granting in part and denying in part 113 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms) Copy to parties.
|
December 4, 2015 |
Filing
108
UNREPORTED ORDER Invalidity chart and non-infringement contentions due 2/1/2016. Status Conference set for 2/12/2016 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Susan G. Braden. Trial on infringement set for 4/18/2016. Trial on damages set for 6/13/2016.. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ms) Copy to parties.
|
November 24, 2015 |
Filing
107
REPORTED MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER Ruling on Indefiniteness Asserted Regarding Certain Claim Terms in United States Patent No. 6,874,729, United States Patent No. 7,097,137, United States Patent No. 8,167,242, United States Patent No. 8,517,306. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls) Copy to parties.
|
October 31, 2013 |
Filing
47
PUBLISHED OPINION granting 31 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1). Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cm) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?