FASTSHIP, LLC v. USA

Plaintiff: FASTSHIP, LLC
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2012cv00484
Filed: August 1, 2012
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Charles F. Lettow
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 REPORTED OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 190 Motion for Attorneys' Fees; granting in part and denying in part 191 Motion for Bill of Costs. The Clerk is directed to enter final judgment for plaintiff in the amount of $7,407,967.36. Signed by Senior Judge Charles F. Lettow. (cs)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 REPORTED OPINION reflecting redactions from the opinion and order previously entered under seal on April 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (EK)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REPORTED OPINION AND ORDER, reflecting no redactions from the opinion and order previously entered under seal on June 26, 2015. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (co)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PUBLISHED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (zlr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FASTSHIP, LLC v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FASTSHIP, LLC
Represented By: Mark Lee Hogge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?