DYNETICS, INC. AND SUBSIDIARIES v. USA
Plaintiff: |
DYNETICS, INC. AND SUBSIDIARIES |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00576 |
Filed: |
September 7, 2012 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Lynn J. Bush |
Presiding Judge: |
Marian Blank Horn |
Nature of Suit: |
Land Condemnation |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 31, 2015 |
Filing
51
REPORTED OPINION denying 37 Plaintiff's Cross Motion; granting 35 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Joint Status Report due by 6/30/2015. Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (rl) Copy to parties.
|
October 22, 2013 |
Filing
15
ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fact Discovery due by 2/19/2014. Status Report due by 3/10/2014 Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?