GLACIER MOUNTAIN, L.P. et al v. USA

Plaintiff: GLACIER MOUNTAIN, L.P. and PRINCIPAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2012cv00582
Filed: September 10, 2012
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Francis M. Allegra
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order of Dismissal. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Marian Blank Horn. (jm5) Service on parties made.
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order: A telephonic Preliminary Status Conference set for 3/12/2013 at 2:00 PM (EST)before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting, in part 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 1/7/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLACIER MOUNTAIN, L.P. et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLACIER MOUNTAIN, L.P.
Represented By: Jay H. Zimbler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRINCIPAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jay H. Zimbler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Cory Arthur Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?