QUAPAW TRIBE OF OKLAHOMA v. USA
Plaintiff: |
QUAPAW TRIBE OF OKLAHOMA |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00592 |
Filed: |
September 11, 2012 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan G. Braden |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 14, 2019 |
Filing
351
REPORTED ORDER Requiring the public disclosure of the parties' settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (nc) Service on parties made.
|
September 12, 2016 |
Filing
188
REPORTED OPINION granting in part and denying in part 153 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 161 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (ad) Copy to parties.
|
October 16, 2015 |
Filing
123
REPORTED OPINION and ORDER: granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion for Discovery Relief. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. [Entry re-docketed for Administrative Purposed Only] (ar) Copy to parties.
|
October 1, 2015 |
Filing
119
REPORTED OPINION granting 83 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (kn) Copy to parties.
|
April 16, 2015 |
Filing
87
REPORTED OPINION denying 59 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 66 Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (jf) Copy to parties.
|
July 16, 2013 |
Filing
23
ORDER denying 6 Motion for More Definite Statement; granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (md) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?