KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC., v. USA
Plaintiff: |
KELLOGG BROWN & ROOT SERVICES, INC., |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00780 |
Filed: |
November 16, 2012 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Lynn J. Bush |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract - Service (CDA) |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 7, 2014 |
Filing
24
REPORTED OPINION granting 8 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1). The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
|
October 21, 2013 |
Filing
22
ORDER LIFTING STAY, SCHEDULING ORDER. Defendant's Response to plaintiff's supplemental briefing due by 10/25/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
|
October 9, 2013 |
Filing
20
ORDER granting 19 Motion to Stay. Immediately upon restoration of appropriations to the DOJ, the parties shall CONFER and, as soon as practible thereafter, shall FILE a Status Report setting forth an agreed upon deadline for the filing of defendant's response to plaintiff's supplemental briefing before the court in this matter. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
|
September 24, 2013 |
Filing
17
ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Supplement Brief. Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief due by 9/30/2013. Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief due by 10/15/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
|
August 5, 2013 |
Filing
13
SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument set for 8/20/2013 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Lynn J. Bush. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
|
August 1, 2013 |
Filing
12
ORDER re 8 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA. The parties are directed to confer and agree to a mutually acceptable date for oral argument on defendants motions to be held in Washington, D.C. The court has the following dates available: August 14, 2013, August 15, 2013; and August 20, 2013. The parties shall CONFER and CONTACT chambers at 202-357-6532 with their proposed date for oral argument by 8/7/2013. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
|
June 10, 2013 |
Filing
11
ORDER STAYING CASE pending briefing in related case (13-169). Once briefing is completed in related case, the court shall determine the scope of the oral argument requested by plaintiff. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?