WATSON v. USA

Plaintiff: RICHARD P. WATSON
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2012cv00785
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Presiding Judge: Emily C. Hewitt
Nature of Suit: Military Pay - Correct Records

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court UNREPORTED ORDER granting 52 Motion to Remand and modifying 41 August 2014 Remand Order (JSR due by 11/16/2015). Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (ss5) Copy to parties.
August 20, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORTED ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motion for Clarification. Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (ss5) Copy to parties.
November 21, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court PUBLISHED OPINION. Status Report due by 2/7/2014. Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (ss5) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WATSON v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD P. WATSON
Represented By: Raymond Jewell Toney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?