WATSON v. USA
Plaintiff: |
RICHARD P. WATSON |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00785 |
Filed: |
November 16, 2012 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Emily C. Hewitt |
Nature of Suit: |
Military Pay - Correct Records |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 17, 2015 |
Filing
69
UNREPORTED ORDER granting 52 Motion to Remand and modifying 41 August 2014 Remand Order (JSR due by 11/16/2015). Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (ss5) Copy to parties.
|
August 20, 2014 |
Filing
42
REPORTED ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motion for Clarification. Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (ss5) Copy to parties.
|
November 21, 2013 |
Filing
30
PUBLISHED OPINION. Status Report due by 2/7/2014. Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (ss5) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?