CENTERSCOPE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. v. USA
Plaintiff: |
CENTERSCOPE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv00883 |
Filed: |
December 14, 2012 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Francis M. Allegra |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract - (Pre Award) Injunctions |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 21, 2012 |
Filing
13
ORDER granting 12 Motion to Consolidate Cases. All further filings in this matter should be filed in Insight Systems Corp. v. United States, 12-863C (Fed. Cl.). Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
December 19, 2012 |
Filing
11
STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/20/2012 at 2:00 PM (EST) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
December 17, 2012 |
Filing
10
SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
December 14, 2012 |
Filing
8
SCHEDULING ORDER: Proposed Protective order due 12/17/2012. Joint Status Report due by 12/19/2012. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?