SEARS et al v. USA

Plaintiff: CLAUDE SEARS, DONALD E. BRACY, ANNA L. BRACY, O. BERNICE DICKKUT RESIDUARY TRUST, FIRST UNION LLC, CHARLES E. LAKIN REVOCABLE TRUST, DERRICK NEDERHOFF, ROGER L. OSGOOD, GLENDA L. OSGOOD, PROSSER FARMS, INC., WILLIAM L. ROBINSON, CORY J. SCHURMAN, DEANNA L. SCHURMAN and CHARLES WILLIAM STEINFELDT
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2012cv00889
Filed: December 18, 2012
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Presiding Judge: Charles F. Lettow
Nature of Suit: Taking - Realty

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 UNREPORTED Order. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Charles F. Lettow. (cs)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 REPORTED OPINION and ORDER granting plaintiffs' motion for approval of settlement. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in the total amount of $3,455,216.13, consisting of $2,237,169.00 in principal and $443,514.16 in interest through December 31, 2017 for prevailing class members, and $541,722.00 in attorneys' fees and $232,810.97 in litigation costs awarded to class counsel pursuant to the Uniform Relocation Act. Interest shall accrue on the total amount of this judgment at the rate of 3.39% from January 1, 2018 through the date of payment by the Department of the Treasury. The judgment is payable to class counsel for distribution to the class according to the terms of this opinion and order a nd the Settlement Agreement. The claims of those class members listed in Exhibit B, admitted at the Fairness Hearing, are dismissed. This opinion and order shall not affect the claims of the members of the trial subclass. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (je)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 REPORTED OPINION granting in part and denying in part 131 Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a). The court amends its prior decision and the judgment to provide that the following amounts shall be awarded to plaintiffs in the trial subclass: &# 036;90,812.97 (Gould), $48,185.83 (Bradley), $48,018.86 (Mosher), $74,773.09 (Heene), and $124,975.97 (Richards). Interest shall be payable on these amounts at the rate of 3.39 percent per annum, compounded quarterly from the date of the taking, August 2, 2012, until the date the judgment is paid. The clerk is directed to enter judgment as amended pursuant to RCFC 54(b) in the aforestated amounts. Plaintiffs may apply for an award of attorneys' fees and expenses under Se ction 304(c) of the Uniform Relocation Assistance Act, 42 U.S.C. § 4654(c), within 30 days after any appellate process has been concluded, or, alternatively, after the time for taking an appeal has expired. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (EK)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 REPORTED OPINION: The following amounts shall be awarded to plaintiffs in the trial subclass: $146,347.73 (Gould), $87,052.83 (Bradley), $55,970.74 (Mosher), $174,381.29 (Heene), and $223,187.53 (Richards). Interest shall be payable on these amounts at the rate of 3.39 percent per annum, compounded quarterly from the date of the taking, August 2, 2012, until the date the judgment is paid. The clerk is directed to enter judgment pursuant to RCFC 54(b) in the aforestated a mounts. Plaintiffs may apply for an award of attorneys' fees and expenses under Section 304(c) of the Uniform Relocation Assistance Act, 42 U.S.C. § 4654(c), within 30 days after any appellate process has been concluded, or, alternatively, after the time for taking an appeal has expired. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (EK)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 REPORTED ORDER denying 56 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part 63 Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: The rate of return from the Moody's Long-Term Aaa Corporate Bond Index, i.e., 3.39 percent, compounded quarterly, shall be used to determine the interest component of the just compensation due to the subclass plaintiffs beyond February 3, 2016. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow.(es)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPORTED OPINION Granting 50 Plaintiffs' Motion for Division of Class Into Subclasses, Motion for Trial Setting as to the Angularly-Bisected Agricultural-Property Subclass, and Notice of Partial Withdrawal from Settlement Negotiations. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow.(es)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEARS et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAUDE SEARS
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Gepford McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD E. BRACY
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Gepford McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA L. BRACY
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Gepford McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O. BERNICE DICKKUT RESIDUARY TRUST
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Gepford McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIRST UNION LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Gepford McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES E. LAKIN REVOCABLE TRUST
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Gepford McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK NEDERHOFF
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Gepford McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER L. OSGOOD
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Gepford McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENDA L. OSGOOD
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Gepford McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROSSER FARMS, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Gepford McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM L. ROBINSON
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Gepford McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORY J. SCHURMAN
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Gepford McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEANNA L. SCHURMAN
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Gepford McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES WILLIAM STEINFELDT
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Gepford McCulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?