APTERYX, INC v. USA
Plaintiff: |
APTERYX, INC |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00117 |
Filed: |
February 13, 2013 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
George W. Miller |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract - Other (CDA) |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 8, 2014 |
Filing
29
UNREPORTED ORDER. Status Report due by 8/11/2014. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis) Copy to parties.
|
December 24, 2013 |
Filing
20
ORDER granting 18 Motion for Discovery "Claw Back" Order. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis) Copy to parties.
|
December 20, 2013 |
Filing
19
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact Discovery complete by 6/13/2014. Joint Status Report due by 6/20/2014. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
August 27, 2013 |
Filing
14
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery completed by 2/14/2014. Joint Status Report due by 2/21/2014. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
August 13, 2013 |
Filing
13
PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Order: Telephonic Preliminary Status Conference set for 8/27/2013 at 10:00 AM (EDT) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
August 12, 2013 |
Filing
12
SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?