ALMANZA v. USA
Plaintiff: |
MANUEL ALMANZA |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00130 |
Filed: |
February 20, 2013 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Francis M. Allegra |
Nature of Suit: |
Civilian Pay - Overtime Compensation |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 9, 2018 |
Filing
160
REPORTED OPINION granting in part and denying in part 140 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bh) Service on parties made.
|
February 16, 2018 |
Filing
149
REPORTED OPINION denying 141 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bh) Service on parties made.
|
January 11, 2018 |
Filing
137
REPORTED OPINION granting in part 114 Amended Motion for Attorneys' Fees; granting 128 Motion for Leave to File. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bh) Service on parties made.
|
November 6, 2017 |
Filing
132
REPORTED OPINION granting 120 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement.Supplemental brief due 11/20/17; Response due 12/4/2017 Signed by Judge Elaine D. Kaplan. (bh) Copy to parties. Modified on 11/6/2017 to add deadlines (vds).
|
October 23, 2013 |
Filing
28
ORDER directing the parties to strike the last sentence of paragraph seven from the proposed notice 26 Notice, filed by all plaintiffs and Defendant (attachment #(1) Exhibit). Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
October 18, 2013 |
Filing
27
ORDER: Defendant shall file its reply to plaintiffs response to defendants motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, to transfer these claims. Reply due by 10/24/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
September 19, 2013 |
Filing
22
ORDER: the parties shall file a revised version of the proposed notice to prospective class members. Notice of Compliance due by 10/2/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
September 16, 2013 |
Filing
20
STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Rescheduling 19 Status Conference Order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/19/2013 at 2:00 PM (EDT)before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
September 10, 2013 |
Filing
19
STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/20/2013 at 2:00 PM (EDT) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
July 18, 2013 |
Filing
14
STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/1/2013 at 2:00 PM (EDT) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
April 10, 2013 |
Filing
8
ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due by 5/22/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
April 8, 2013 |
Filing
6
SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?