COMPLIANCE SOLUTIONS OCCUPATIONAL TRAINERS, INC. v. USA
Plaintiff: |
COMPLIANCE SOLUTIONS OCCUPATIONAL TRAINERS, INC. |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00194 |
Filed: |
March 15, 2013 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Francis M. Allegra |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract - Service (CDA) |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 16, 2014 |
Filing
24
OPINION(Redacted) re: 22 Sealed Opinion of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
May 7, 2013 |
Filing
15
ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Response due by 6/13/2013. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
April 5, 2013 |
Filing
13
SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
March 21, 2013 |
Filing
7
ORDER granting, in part, and denying, in part 6 Motion to file this case under seal. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?