HANRAHAN v. USA
Plaintiff: |
WILLIAM B. HANRAHAN |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00200 |
Filed: |
March 19, 2013 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Lynn J. Bush |
Presiding Judge: |
Marian Blank Horn |
Nature of Suit: |
Civilian Pay - Back Pay |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 10, 2013 |
Filing
20
SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Disclosures due by 9/30/2013. Non-Expert Discovery due by 6/30/2014. Dsignation of Experts due by 6/30/2014. Plaintiff's Expert Report(s) due by 7/31/2014. Defendant's Expert Report(s) due by 8/29/2014. Expert Discovery completed by 10/31/2014. Status Report due by 11/14/2014. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
|
July 12, 2013 |
Filing
17
ORDER granting 15 Motion to Withdraw Action from ADR. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?