CAMERON LANNING CORMACK v. USA
Plaintiff: |
CAMERON LANNING CORMACK |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00232 |
Filed: |
April 3, 2013 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles F. Lettow |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 26, 2015 |
Filing
99
REPORTED OPINION reflecting no redactions from the document previously filed under seal on August 18, 2015. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gk)
|
November 4, 2014 |
Filing
80
REPORTED OPINION Providing Claim Construction for U.S. Patent No. 7,781,693 and Granting 69 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gk)
|
August 21, 2014 |
Filing
76
REPORTED OPINION granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall produce all communications, regardless of creation date, that relate to the prior-art references addressed in a disclosed document dated September 13, 200 4. Plaintiff is not required to produce any documents generated after the filing date of the patent application that do not relate to the issues of date of conception, date of reduction to practice, and due diligence. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (EB)
|
July 18, 2014 |
Filing
62
REPORTED OPINION granting 45 Defendant-Intervenor's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; granting 48 Defendant-Intervenor's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant-Intervenor. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (zlr)
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?