GROOMS & COMPANY CONSTRUCTION, INC. v. USA

Plaintiff: GROOMS & COMPANY CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2013cv00426
Filed: June 27, 2013
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
County: None
Presiding Judge: Lynn J. Bush
Referring Judge: Marian Blank Horn
Nature of Suit: Contract - Construction (CDA)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court UNREPORTED ORDER. The Clerks Office is directed to DISMISS, with prejudice, plaintiffs complaint in this matter for failure to prosecute pursuant to RCFC 41(b). Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (kh) Copy to parties.
November 10, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court Docketed for Administrative Purposes ORDER denying 28 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 41(b). Plaintiffs counsel shall PROVIDE a copy of this order to each of the principals of Grooms & Company Construction, Inc. on or before November 16, 2015. On or before November 30, 2015, plaintiff shall FILE the parties Joint Status Report proposing a revision of the discovery schedule set forth in the courts order of June 4, 2015.. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (jt1) Copy to parties.
January 2, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial disclosures due by 1/30/2014. Fact Discovery due by 10/28/2014. On or before December 16, 2014, plaintiff shall designate expert(s) witnesses and serve report(s) on defendant. Defendant shall designa te expert(s) witnesses and serve reports and response on plaintiff, on or before February 17, 2015. Plaintiff shall serve response report(s) to defendant on or before April 16, 2015. Defendant shall serve reply report(s) to plaintiff on or before May 19, 2015. Experts shall be available for deposition: May 25, 2016 - June 25, 2015. Status Report due by 7/16/2015 Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GROOMS & COMPANY CONSTRUCTION, INC. v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GROOMS & COMPANY CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Represented By: Cynthia S. Malyszek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Douglas Thomas Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?