HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY (THE) v. USA
Plaintiff: |
HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY (THE) |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00500 |
Filed: |
July 22, 2013 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Francis M. Allegra |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract - Construction (CDA) |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 29, 2020 |
Filing
176
REPORTED ORDER; ECF No. 169 reissued with redactions. Signed by Judge David A. Tapp. (jm) Service on parties made.
|
April 12, 2018 |
Filing
112
REPORTED OPINION denying 107 Motion to Strike Expert Report of Tim Van Noy. Defendant may disclose a surrebuttal addressing the Van Noy Report by 7/11/2018. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (jhk)
|
September 15, 2017 |
Filing
93
REPORTED OPINION granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion to Amend Pleadings. Amended answers due 9/22/2017. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (pp) Copy to parties.
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing
32
REPORTED OPINION granting 15 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1). Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1)
|
September 23, 2013 |
Filing
10
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. The Clerk is directed to effectuate the transfer. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
September 16, 2013 |
Filing
8
ORDER granting, in part, 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Response due by 11/15/2013. No further enlargements of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
August 8, 2013 |
Filing
6
SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?