MARTIN et al v. USA
Plaintiff: |
DONALD MARTIN, JR., PATRICIA A. MANBECK, JEFF ROBERTS, JOSE ROJAS and RANDALL SUMNER |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00834 |
Filed: |
October 24, 2013 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Patricia E. Campbell-Smith |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 24, 2017 |
Filing
161
**REISSUED** 160 REPORTED OPINION AND ORDER granting 153 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, denying 154 Motion for Summary Judgment. Reissued only for the purpose of correcting the caption to include Case No. 16-1297 consistent with the order consolidating the cases. See Case No. 16-1297, ECF No. 9. Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (TQ) Copy to parties.
|
February 13, 2017 |
Filing
160
REPORTED OPINION AND ORDER granting 153 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, denying 154 Motion for Summary Judgment. On or before March 17, 2017, plaintiffs shall submit a draft of their damages calculations to defendant. On or before March 31, 2017, the parties shall confer and discuss any disagreements as to the calculations. And, on or before April 7, 2017, the parties shall jointly file a statement with the court reporting the results of both the conference and the calculations.Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (mp) Copy to parties.
|
October 15, 2015 |
Filing
125
UNREPORTED Opinion & Order denying 87 plaintiffs' motion for equitable tolling. Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (vl) Copy to parties.
|
July 31, 2014 |
Filing
38
REPORTED OPINION granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6). Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (svw) Copy to parties.
|
June 2, 2014 |
Filing
37
REPORTED ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (svw) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?