WEEKS v. USA
Plaintiff: |
JANIE WEEKS |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv01025 |
Filed: |
December 30, 2013 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Margaret M. Sweeney |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 24, 2019 |
Filing
118
REPORTED OPINION. The clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (pp) Service on parties made.
|
January 15, 2016 |
Filing
31
REPORTED OPINION denying 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USA. Status Report due by 2/16/2016. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (sp)
|
January 3, 2014 |
Filing
7
ORDER re 1 Complaint. Plaintiff's claims against the Housing Authority of the City of Opp, Alabama, are dismissed. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1)
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?