KAPLAN v. USA
Plaintiff: |
KATHLEEN M. KAPLAN |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00067 |
Filed: |
January 27, 2014 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Eric G. Bruggink |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 3, 2017 |
Filing
130
REPORTED OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ew) Copy to parties.
|
April 13, 2016 |
Filing
57
REPORTED OPINION (Public Version): denying 48 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 50 Cross Motion. The parties are directed to consult and propose a trial schedule by April 15, 2016. Notice of Compliance due by 4/15/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (ar) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?