MEMMER v. USA
Plaintiff: |
JEFFREY MEMMER |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00135 |
Filed: |
February 18, 2014 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Margaret M. Sweeney |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 20, 2021 |
Filing
195
REPORTED OPINION denying 188 Motion for Reconsideration and determining the propriety of cost-to-cure damages. Joint Status Report with interest calculations due by 6/3/2021. Signed by Senior Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1)
|
November 2, 2020 |
Filing
186
REPORTED TRIAL OPINION. Joint Status Report due by 11/16/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1)
|
July 7, 2017 |
Filing
75
UNREPORTED ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 7/21/2017. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1)
|
July 10, 2015 |
Filing
34
REPORTED OPINION granting in part and denying in part 20 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part 24 CROSS MOTION. Joint Status Report due by 7/24/2015. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (kb1)
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?