BISHOP HILL ENERGY LLC v. USA

Plaintiff: BISHOP HILL ENERGY LLC
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2014cv00251
Filed: March 28, 2014
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Lynn J. Bush
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 REISSUED OPINION--Filed this date, unsealed. Signed by Senior Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (smm)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 UNREPORTED ORDER denying 115 Motion to Compel; granting 125 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Senior Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 UNREPORTED OPINION granting 95 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b). Defendant shall FILE its Amended Answer and Counterclaim under seal and a Redacted Public Version by 6/16/2016. Joint Status Report due by 6/27/2016, apprising the court of th e status of fact discovery and proposing a schedule for expert discovery that reflects the parties' consensus on an appropriate schedule. Defendant shall FILE any Revised Motion to Compel Response to Subpoena to Invenergy Investment Company LLC by 6/29/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ) Copy to parties.
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 UNREPORTED OPINION denying 41 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (kh) Copy to parties.
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 UNREPORTED OPINION denying 43 Motion to Substitute Party. Plaintiff shall FILE either a Motion to Join Invenergy Wind LLC as Plaintiff under RCFC 25(c), or a Notice informing the court of any agreed-upon alternative to its proposed assignment, on or before 12/15/2015. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (kh) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BISHOP HILL ENERGY LLC v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BISHOP HILL ENERGY LLC
Represented By: John Carney Hayes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Miranda Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?