SPACE EXPLORATION TECHNOLOGIES CORP. v. USA

Plaintiff: SPACE EXPLORATION TECHNOLOGIES CORP.
Defendant: USA
Intervenor_defendant: UNITED LAUNCH SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv00354
Filed: April 28, 2014
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Susan G. Braden
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Docketed for Administrative Purposes REDACTED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING JANUARY 7, 2015, MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jt1) Copy to parties.
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 UNREPORTED ORDER NOTICE granting re: 87 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented) pursuant to Rule 83.1(c)(4). Added attorney Charles J. Cooper for UNITED LAUNCH SERVICES, LLC. Attorney Michael F. Mason terminated. Entered by the Clerk.. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cm) Copy to parties.
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 UNREPORTED Mediation Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cm) Copy to parties.
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 UNREPORTED ORDER NOTICE granting re: 43 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented) pursuant to Rule 83.1(c)(4). Attorney Jason Andrew Carey terminated. Entered by the Clerk. The Clerk of Court will enter the substitution of counsel on the docket , and counsel of record for Defendant-Intervenor will now be listed as follows: Michael F. Mason HOGAN LOVELLS 555 13th Street, NW Washington, D.C. 20004 (202) 637-5499- Phone (202) 637-5910- Fax mike.mason@hoganlovells.com. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cm) Copy to parties.
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 UNREPORTED ORDER granting 18 Motion To Dissolve Preliminary Injunction 10 . Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cm) Copy to parties.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPACE EXPLORATION TECHNOLOGIES CORP. v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: UNITED LAUNCH SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Michael F. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Timothy Paul McIlmail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPACE EXPLORATION TECHNOLOGIES CORP.
Represented By: Richard James Vacura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?