CYIOS CORPORATION v. USA
Plaintiff: |
CYIOS CORPORATION |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00148 |
Filed: |
February 18, 2015 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Patricia E. Campbell-Smith |
Nature of Suit: |
Negotiable Instrument |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 23, 2015 |
Filing
34
REPORTED OPINION (public version of sealed Opinion issued October 26, 2015). Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (rl) Copy to parties.
|
August 21, 2015 |
Filing
25
REPORTED OPINION (public version of sealed Opinion issued July 31, 2015). Signed by Chief Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (rl) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?