KWR CONSTRUCTION, INC. v. USA
Plaintiff: |
KWR CONSTRUCTION, INC. |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00156 |
Filed: |
February 18, 2015 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Nancy B. Firestone |
Nature of Suit: |
Negotiable Instrument |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 25, 2015 |
Filing
149
REPORTED OPINION (PUBLISHED). Plaintiff's motion for judgment on administrative record GRANTED. Defendant's cross-motion DENIED. Agency's decision to reject plaintiff's proposal VACATED and REMANDED to agency until January 11, 2016 for further action consistent with this opinion. Defendant shall file status report by 1/11/2016. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk) Copy to parties.
|
October 15, 2015 |
Filing
138
REPORTED ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery and Fourth Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record -- Originally filed under seal on 9/22/2015. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk) Copy to parties.
|
July 21, 2015 |
Filing
84
UNREPORTED OPINION originally filed under seal on March 23, 2015. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (sr) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?