October 4, 2023 |
Filing
636
REPORTED OPINION: The remaining claims shall be construed as stated in the opinion. Status Report due by 10/11/2023. Signed by Senior Judge Charles F. Lettow. (khp)
|
February 23, 2023 |
Filing
622
**RE-DOCKETED 621 FOR POSTING TO THE COURT'S WEBSITE** UNREPORTED ORDER denying 618 Motion Lifting Stay. Signed by Senior Judge Charles F. Lettow. (tb) Service on parties made.
|
July 27, 2022 |
Filing
617
REPORTED OPINION AND ORDER, granting 607 Motion to Stay. The parties shall file a joint status report within ten business days after the final determination in the ex parte proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Charles F. Lettow. (klg)
|
February 18, 2022 |
Filing
584
MODIFIED REPORTED OPINION AND ORDER, reflecting modifications to 578 the opinion and order previously entered under seal on February 9, 2022. The parties proposed no redactions. The court modified one area of relief. Signed by Senior Judge Charles F. Lettow. (klg)
|
January 13, 2022 |
Filing
568
REPORTED OPINION denying 530 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Charles F. Lettow. (klg)
|
October 8, 2021 |
Filing
544
REPORTED OPINION AND ORDER, reflecting redactions from 541 the opinion and order previously entered under seal on October 1, 2021. Signed by Senior Judge Charles F. Lettow. (klg)
|
August 27, 2021 |
Filing
524
REPORTED OPINION granting in part and denying in part 511 Motion to Compel; granting 521 Motion to Supplement Pleadings - Rule 15(d) (Privilege Logs due by 9/17/2021). Signed by Senior Judge Charles F. Lettow. (klg)
|
July 15, 2021 |
Filing
508
REPORTED OPINION denying 499 Motion to Permit SAIC Access to the Protective Order. Signed by Senior Judge Charles F. Lettow. (hlk)
|
November 30, 2020 |
Filing
454
REPORTED OPINION: Reflecting redaction to 445 opinion issued 11/20/20. Signed by Senior Judge Charles F. Lettow. (hlk)
|
September 26, 2019 |
Filing
307
REPORTED OPINION granting 294 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Third Amended Complaint due by 10/11/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Charles F. Lettow. (sg)
|
April 18, 2019 |
Filing
282
REPORTED OPINION: Defendant's motion 274 to enforce the protective order entered August 17, 2017, or issue a new protective order, is DENIED. Plaintiffs' motion 268 to compel discovery as to source code is DENIED. Plaintiffs' mo tion for an extension of time to respond to discovery and for a protective order 256 is DENIED. Defendant's motion 269 to compel interrogatory responses and document production is GRANTED, but the attendant motions 269 to determine the sufficiency of objections and to deem as admitted certain requests for admission are DENIED. Plaintiffs' motion 278 for reconsideration of the court's order of March 11, 2019 is DENIED. On or before June 21, 2019, the parties are invited to propose a new schedule for discovery and other preparatory proceedings, taking into account this ruling. Signed by Senior Judge Charles F. Lettow. (cs)
|
September 25, 2018 |
Filing
243
REPORTED OPINION: Patent case; denying 194 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Rule 12(c); granting 205 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b); the 13 terms identified by the parties shall be construed as stated in the opinion. Signed by Senior Judge Charles F. Lettow. (cs)
|
August 17, 2017 |
Filing
162
UNREPORTED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 157 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (EK)
|
July 26, 2017 |
Filing
159
REPORTED OPINION: Plaintiffs' motion to compel the government to produce documents, ECF No. 126, is DENIED with respect to potentially infringing systems procured, manufactured, or used by the government prior to February 12, 2013, except for those systems that were subsequently modified or upgraded by the government after that date. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (EK)
|
June 16, 2017 |
Filing
149
UNREPORTED ORDER granting in part and denying in part 126 Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs shall submit their rewritten requests for production to government counsel on or before 6/23/2017, and the government shall respond on or before 7/24/2017. The government is also ordered to respond to plaintiffs' requests for production regarding communications between and among the government and defendant-intervenors on or before July 24, 2017. To the extent it can claim that any of these documents are privileged, the government is ordered to produce a privilege log pursuant to RCFC 26(b)(5)(A). Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (EK)
|
April 5, 2016 |
Filing
41
REPORTED OPINION granting 23 Motion to Notify Interested Party; granting 25 Motion to Notify Interested Party; granting 30 Motion to Notify Interested Party; granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time (JPSR due by 5/20/2016). For the reasons st ated, the government's motions to authorize notice to the eight named entities pursuant to Rule 14(b) are GRANTED. The clerk shall issue notice to each entity, as specified in RCFC 14(b)(3). Service of the notices shall be accomplished in accord with the provisions of RCFC 14(b)(4). The government's motion for an enlargement of time, ECF No. 33, is also GRANTED, and the joint preliminary status report shall be due on or before May 20, 2016. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj)
|
December 17, 2015 |
Filing
21
REPORTED OPINION denying 8 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1); granting 9 Motion for More Definite Statement. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint on or before January 26, 2016. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj)
|