WOODIES HOLDINGS, L.L.C. v. USA
Plaintiff: |
WOODIES HOLDINGS, L.L.C. |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00962 |
Filed: |
September 2, 2015 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Eric G. Bruggink |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 13, 2019 |
Filing
167
REPORTED OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jpk1) Service on parties made.
|
December 14, 2017 |
Filing
80
UNREPORTED ORDER denying 64 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 66 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 70 Cross Motion; ( Status Report due by 1/5/2018). Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jpk1) Copy to parties.
|
November 18, 2016 |
Filing
36
UNREPORTED ORDER granting 28 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; ( Status Report due by 12/1/2016). Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jpk1) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?