HINDMAN v. USA
Plaintiff: |
NICHOLAS HINDMAN |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00257 |
Filed: |
February 24, 2016 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan G. Braden |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 20, 2017 |
Filing
18
REPORTED OPINION Order of Dismissal granting 10 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) and (6) The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Susan G. Braden. (pt) Copy to parties.
|
February 28, 2017 |
Filing
16
REPORTED ORDER Status Report due by 3/10/2017. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (pt) Copy to parties.
|
January 10, 2017 |
Filing
13
OPINION Status Report due by 3/10/2017. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (pt) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?