NEW YORK AND PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL v. USA
Plaintiff: |
NEW YORK AND PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL |
Defendant: |
USA |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00496 |
Filed: |
April 20, 2016 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
County: |
None |
Presiding Judge: |
Nancy B. Firestone |
Nature of Suit: |
Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 12, 2022 |
Filing
92
REPORTED OPINION (reissued for publication of 90 SEALED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 78 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.) Signed by Judge Eleni M. Roumel. (hb) Service on parties made.
|
February 17, 2021 |
Filing
70
REPORTED OPINION granting 49 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 50 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Joint Status Report due by March 3, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Eleni M. Roumel. (srb1) Service on parties made.
|
September 19, 2016 |
Filing
15
REPORTED OPINION granting 8 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1). The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (ay) Copy to parties.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?