BEBERMAN v. USA
Plaintiff: JULIE BEBERMAN
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2017cv00179
Filed: February 6, 2017
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Patricia E. Campbell-Smith
Nature of Suit: Civilian Pay, Back Pay
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 UNREPORTED ORDER granting 50 Motion to Stay filed by USA, staying proceedings pending the outcome of plaintiff's appeal of the district court case now before the Third Circuit. The Clerk's Office is directed to STAY this matter until f urther order of the court. The parties are directed to FILE a joint status report informing the court of the Third Circuit's decision, and proposing an agreed upon schedule for proceeding in this case, within fourteen days of publication thereof. Signed by Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (TQ) Service on parties made.
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPORTED OPINION granting 13 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), and directing the clerk's office to RETURN any future filings that are not in compliance with this court's rules to plaintiff, UNFILED, without further order. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (dls) Service on parties made. (Plaintiff served via certified mail; Article No. 7017 1450 0000 1346 0423)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORTED OPINION granting 6 Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) The clerk's office is directed to VACATE the April 7, 2017 judgment and re-open the case. Defendant shall file it's answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint on or before August 18, 2017. . Signed by Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (ew) Copy to parties.
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORTED OPINION: Ms. Beberman's complaint is DISMISSED sua sponte for lack of jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (ew) Copy to parties. Tracking #7014 1200 0000 9093 6965.
Search for this case: BEBERMAN v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIE BEBERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Margaret Joy Jantzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?