ZEIDMAN TECHNOLOGIES, INC. v. USA
Case Number: |
1:2017cv01662 |
Filed: |
February 11, 2019 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract - (Post Award) Injunction |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 14, 2019 |
Filing
111
REPORTED OPINION of the court's opinion issued under seal on July 24, 2019, see 107 denying 44 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record; denying 45 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record; denying 48 Cross Motion; granting 51 Motion to Dismiss; granting 21 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. On or before 7/31/2019, defendant shall FILE a Notice of the filing of the declarations of Ambros D. Montoya and David Shahady, attaching the declarations as presented in defendant's motion, ECF Nos. 21-1 and 21-2, as a separate docket entry in this matter. Signed by Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (TQ) Service on parties made.
|
February 26, 2019 |
Filing
101
RE-ISSUE of the court's REPORTED OPINION originally filed on February 11, 2019, See ECF No. 99 . This opinion was re-issued in order to clarify several instances in which the court referred to plaintiff, but should have referred to plaintiff's counsel. Signed by Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (TQ) Service on parties made.
|
February 11, 2019 |
Filing
99
REPORTED OPINION of the court's OPINION on Protective Order Sanctions, originally filed under seal on 1/15/2019, see 94 . Signed by Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (TQ) Service on parties made.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?