FMS INVESTMENT CORP. v. USA

Plaintiff: FMS INVESTMENT CORP.
Defendant: USA
Intervenor_defendant: PERFORMANT RECOVERY, INC. and WINDHAM PROFESSIONALS, INC.
Consolidated_plaintiff: ACCOUNT CONTROL TECHNOLOGY, INC., TRANSWORLD SYSTEMS INC., GC SERVICES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, TEXAS GUARANTEED STUDENT LOAN CORP., CBE GROUP, INC., PROGRESSIVE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., PIONEER CREDIT RECOVERY, INC., COAST PROFESSIONAL, INC., CENTRAL CREDIT SERVICES, LLC, DELTA MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES, INC., CONTINENTAL SERVICE GROUP, INC., GATESTONE AND CO. INTERNATIONAL, INC., IMMEDIATE CREDIT RECOVERY, INC., ALLIED INTERSTATE LLC, AUTOMATED COLLECTION SERVICES, INC., COLLECTO, INC., WILLIAMS AND FUDGE, INC., VALUE RECOVERY HOLDING, LLC and ALLTRAN EDUCATION, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00204
Filed: February 9, 2018
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
County: None
Presiding Judge: Thomas C. Wheeler
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1491
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2018 249 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORTED OPINION: granting 189 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1); denying 214 , 215 , 221 , 223 , 226 , 227 , 228 , 230 , 233 , 235 , 236 , 246 , Motions to Supplement Pleadings - Rule 15(d); finding as moot 140 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6); and LIFTING 106 , Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mg) Service on parties made.
May 25, 2018 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASES: granting 189 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1); denying 214 , 215 , 221 , 223 , 226 , 227 , 228 , 230 , 233 , 235 , 236 , 246 , Motions to Supplement Pleadings - Rule 15(d); finding as moot 140 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6) and LIFTING 106 , Preliminary Injunction. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mg) Service on parties made. Modified on 5/25/2018 to add additional text (ar).
March 29, 2018 163 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORTED OPINION granting 110 Motion to Disqualify. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mg) Service on parties made.
March 23, 2018 160 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORTED ORDER regarding 149 Defendant's Notice and Plaintiffs' Motions to Supplement the Administrative Record, and granting 110 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Defendant's Notice regarding document production due by 3/28/2018. Defendant's Notice regarding Department of Education timeline due by 4/11/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mg) Service on parties made.
March 6, 2018 126 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORTED OPINION granting 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and granting Motions for Preliminary Injunctions in Case Nos. 18-206C, 18-208C, and 18-246C. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (mg) Service on parties made.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the United States Federal Claims Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FMS INVESTMENT CORP. v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FMS INVESTMENT CORP.
Represented By: David Ronald Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: David Richard Pehlke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: PERFORMANT RECOVERY, INC.
Represented By: Michael Danton McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: WINDHAM PROFESSIONALS, INC.
Represented By: David Thomas Ralston, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: ACCOUNT CONTROL TECHNOLOGY, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan S. Aronie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: TRANSWORLD SYSTEMS INC.
Represented By: Paul Albert Debolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: GC SERVICES LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: William M. Jack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: TEXAS GUARANTEED STUDENT LOAN CORP.
Represented By: Thomas Parker McLish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: CBE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Jeffery Mitchell Chiow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: PROGRESSIVE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: PIONEER CREDIT RECOVERY, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: COAST PROFESSIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Megan Carey Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: CENTRAL CREDIT SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence S. Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: DELTA MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: John R. Tolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: CONTINENTAL SERVICE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Edward Hulvey Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: GATESTONE AND CO. INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Michael A. Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: IMMEDIATE CREDIT RECOVERY, INC.
Represented By: Robert Kiel Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: ALLIED INTERSTATE LLC
Represented By: Stuart B. Nibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: AUTOMATED COLLECTION SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: John Ryan Prairie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: COLLECTO, INC.
Represented By: Joseph James Petrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: WILLIAMS AND FUDGE, INC.
Represented By: Holly Anne Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: VALUE RECOVERY HOLDING, LLC
Represented By: James C. Fontana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: ALLTRAN EDUCATION, INC.
Represented By: Daniel R. Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?