FOX LOGISTICS AND CONSTRUCTION COMPANY v. USA
Case Number: |
1:2018cv01395 |
Filed: |
September 25, 2019 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract - Construction (CDA) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 3, 2021 |
Filing
65
SCHEDULING ORDER: Remote oral argument on Defendants renewed Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 53) is scheduled for February 22, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. EST via videoconference. Oral Argument set for 2/22/2021 11:00 AM in Chambers (Videoteleconference) before Judge Edward H. Meyers. Signed by Judge Edward H. Meyers. (meh) Service on parties made.
|
September 4, 2020 |
Filing
52
UNREPORTED ORDER denying 46 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (nc) Service on parties made.
|
September 25, 2019 |
Filing
34
REPORTED ORDER staying consideration of 15 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1); denying as moot 31 Motion to Strike. Joint Status Report due by 10/11/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas C. Wheeler. (nc) Service on parties made.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?