E&I GLOBAL ENERGY SERVICES, INC. et al v. USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00244
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Office: COFC Office
Nature of Suit: Contract - Construction (CDA)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1491 Tucker Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 REPORTED POST-TRIAL OPINION. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for the United States. Signed by Judge David A. Tapp. (jm) Service on parties made.
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPORTED OPINION Granting-In-Part and Denying-In-Part 42 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Denying 50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Granting 53 Cross Motion. The Court will hold a status and scheduling conference on April 29, 2021 to discuss the remaining issues and set this matter for trial. Signed by Judge David A. Tapp. (jm) Service on parties made.
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPORTED ORDER Denying 47 Motion for Reconsideration; Denying 48 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David A. Tapp. (jm) Service on parties made.
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORTED OPINION granting in part and denying in part 5 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) and (6). Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (rr) Service on parties made.
Search for this case: E&I GLOBAL ENERGY SERVICES, INC. et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?