E-NUMERATE SOLUTIONS, INC. et al v. USA
Case Number: |
1:2019cv00859 |
Filed: |
August 7, 2020 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 29, 2024 |
Filing
116
REPORTED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPINION AND ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 3/14/2024. The Clerk is directed to correct the caption in this case. Signed by Judge Ryan T. Holte. (nd) Service on parties made.
|
March 22, 2023 |
Filing
109
REPORTED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPINION AND ORDER. The government's supplemental brief and supplemental expert report due by 4/5/2023; plaintiffs' response due by 4/19/2023. Signed by Judge Ryan T. Holte. (sav) Service on parties made.
|
August 7, 2020 |
Filing
27
REPORTED OPINION denying 8 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6). Government Answer due by 8/21/2020. Signed by Judge Ryan T. Holte. (nb7) Service on parties made.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?