ADEGBITE et al v. USA
Case Number: |
1:2020cv01183 |
Filed: |
February 10, 2021 |
Court: |
United States Federal Claims Court |
Office: |
COFC Office |
Nature of Suit: |
Civilian Pay - FLSA |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 29, 2021 |
Filing
18
REPORTED OPINION granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6); granting 9 Motion for Leave to File ; granting 16 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Edward H. Meyers. (rmc) Service on parties made.
|
February 17, 2021 |
Filing
13
SCHEDULING ORDER: Remote oral argument on 7 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) is scheduled for March 3, 2021 at 10:00 AM EST. Oral Argument set for 3/3/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chambers (Videoconference) before Judge Edward H. Meyers. Signed by Judge Edward H. Meyers. (aak) Service on parties made.
|
February 10, 2021 |
Filing
12
SCHEDULING ORDER: Remote oral argument on 7 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) is scheduled for March 5, 2021 at 10:00 AM EST. Oral Argument set for 3/5/2021 10:00 AM EST in Chambers (Videoconference) before Judge Edward H. Meyers. Signed by Judge Edward H. Meyers. (aak) Service on parties made.
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?