ABLES et al v. USA
Plaintiff: HEATHER ABLES, KAREN ACKERMAN, JUSTIN AGARD, JAMES ANDERSON, II, RICKY ANTHONY, DIONNE ANTHONY-HAMPTON, DEONTE AUSTIN, KRYSTAL AVERY, DONTERIO BAKER and KENYON BANKS
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2022cv00539
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Patricia E Campbell-Smith
Nature of Suit: Civilian Pay - Back Pay
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT (Multiple Plaintiffs Summary) Updated Chart No. 2 re: #5 Scheduling Order,,,,,, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Whitehead, Jack)
July 1, 2022 Filing 14 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against USA, filed by All Plaintiffs. Amendment to #1 Complaint, #7 Amended Complaint, , filed by All Plaintiffs.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Whitehead, Jack) Modified on 7/5/2022 - terminated answer deadline (jt1).
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER STAYING CASE; granting #12 Motion to Stay. The clerk's office is directed to STAY this case until further order of the court. As defendant has consented, during the pendency of the stay, the court GRANTS plaintiffs leave of court to amend their complaint for the limited purpose of adding additional plaintiffs; If an amended complaint is filed, the clerks office is directed to TERMINATE any answer deadline generated by the courts docketing system, as this matter is stayed; and, Within thirty days of the final, unappealable Federal Circuits decision in Adams v. United States, No. 21-1662, the parties are directed to CONFER and FILE a joint status report proposing the next steps in this litigation. The joint status report shall include the parties' position on the continuance of the stay in this case. Signed by Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (TQ) Service on parties made.
June 30, 2022 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Stay proceedings , filed by USA.Response due by 7/14/2022.(Sinani, Liridona)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Striking #9 Amended Complaint and #10 Status Report (Multiple Plaintiffs Summary) pursuant to RCFC 15(a)(1), (2). Signed by Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (TQ) Service on parties made.
June 22, 2022 Filing 10 See Order of 06/24/2022 Striking STATUS REPORT (Multiple Plaintiffs Summary) Updated Chart No. 2 re: #5 Scheduling Order,,,,,, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Whitehead, Jack)
June 22, 2022 Filing 9 See Order of 06/24/2022 Striking Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against USA, filed by All Plaintiffs. Amendment to #1 Complaint, #7 Amended Complaint, , filed by All Plaintiffs.Answer due by 8/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Whitehead, Jack)(tjk).
June 13, 2022 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT (Multiple Plaintiffs Summary) Updated Chart No. 1 re: #7 Amended Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Whitehead, Jack)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against USA, filed by All Plaintiffs. Amendment to #1 Complaint, , filed by All Plaintiffs. Answer due by 8/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Whitehead, Jack) Modified on 6/15/2022 - corrected answer deadline (jt1).
June 3, 2022 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT (Multiple Plaintiffs Summary) Updated Chart No. 1 re: #5 Scheduling Order,,,,,, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Whitehead, Jack)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MULTIPLE PLAINTIFFS SUMMARY ORDER. On or before 7/8/2022, plaintiffs are directed to FILE a status report attaching their multiple plaintiffs summary to include the required information in this order for all plaintiffs who have been named in the complaints filed in this case. Plaintiffs are further directed to FILE an updated chart following these same procedures within SEVEN days of adding or removing any plaintiffs for the duration of this case. Plaintiffs shall file all such charts under the Status Report (Multiple Plaintiffs Summary) docketing event in the courts CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (TQ) Service on parties made.
May 24, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Liridona Sinani for USA . (Sinani, Liridona)
May 17, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (tb)
May 17, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Patricia E. Campbell-Smith. (tb)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA (DOJ) (Filing fee $402, Receipt number AUSFCC-7896202) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by All Plaintiffs. Answer due by 7/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Exhibit A), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tb)

Search for this case: ABLES et al v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER ABLES
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN ACKERMAN
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN AGARD
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES ANDERSON, II
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY ANTHONY
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIONNE ANTHONY-HAMPTON
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEONTE AUSTIN
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRYSTAL AVERY
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONTERIO BAKER
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENYON BANKS
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Liridona Sinani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?