ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC v. USA
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC
Defendant: USA
Intervenor Defendant: KROPP HOLDINGS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2023cv02047
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: United States Federal Claims Court
Presiding Judge: Loren A Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract - (Post Award) Injunction
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1491 Tucker Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting #33 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's and defendant-intervenor's Cross-Motions and Responses to plaintiff's MJAR due by 2/7/2024. Plaintiff's Reply and Response due by 2/26/2024. Defendant's and defendant-intervenor's Replies due by 3/13/2024. Signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. (ts) Service on parties made.
January 25, 2024 Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Fileuntil 02/07/2024 to Filing of Response to Plaintiff's MJAR and Defendant Cross-MJAR , filed by USA.Response due by 2/8/2024.(Roberson, John)
January 12, 2024 Filing 32 **SEALED** MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record , filed by ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC.Response due by 2/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Clementi Declaration, #2 Exhibit J&A Comparison Chart)(Canni, Todd)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. Signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. (ts) Service on parties made.
January 9, 2024 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record by 10 pages , filed by ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC.Response due by 1/23/2024.(Toth, Kaitlyn)
December 15, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE, filed by USA re #28 Administrative Record . (Roberson, John)
December 15, 2023 Filing 28 **SEALED**ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD , filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tabs 1-52, #2 Exhibit Tabs 53-98)(Roberson, John)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #9 Defendant-Intervenor's Motion to Intervene. Signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. (ts) Service on parties made.
December 12, 2023 Filing 26 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Thomas A. Pettit, filed by KROPP HOLDINGS, INC..Response due by 12/14/2023.(Holman, Craig)
December 12, 2023 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Kara L. Daniels, filed by KROPP HOLDINGS, INC..Response due by 12/14/2023.(Holman, Craig)
December 12, 2023 Filing 24 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Craig A. Holman, filed by KROPP HOLDINGS, INC..Response due by 12/14/2023.(Holman, Craig)
December 8, 2023 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Kaitlyn E. Toth, filed by ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC.Response due by 12/11/2023.(Toth, Kaitlyn) Modified on 12/11/2023 to terminate pending gavel (vds).
December 8, 2023 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Stephen E. Ruscus, filed by ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC.Response due by 12/11/2023.(Toth, Kaitlyn) Modified on 12/11/2023 to terminate pending gavel (vds).
December 8, 2023 Filing 21 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Kevin N. Dorn, filed by ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC.Response due by 12/11/2023.(Toth, Kaitlyn) Modified on 12/11/2023 to terminate pending gavel (vds).
December 8, 2023 Filing 20 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Aleksey Dabbs, filed by ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC.Response due by 12/11/2023.(Toth, Kaitlyn) Modified on 12/11/2023 to terminate pending gavel (vds).
December 8, 2023 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by J. Matthew Carter, filed by ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC.Response due by 12/11/2023.(Toth, Kaitlyn) Modified on 12/11/2023 to terminate pending gavel (vds).
December 8, 2023 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Todd J. Canni, filed by ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC.Response due by 12/11/2023.(Toth, Kaitlyn) Modified on 12/11/2023 to terminate pending gavel (vds).
December 8, 2023 Filing 17 APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Kevin T. Barnett, filed by ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC.Response due by 12/11/2023.(Toth, Kaitlyn) Modified on 12/11/2023 to terminate pending gavel (vds).
December 7, 2023 Filing 16 REDACTED DOCUMENT redacting #1 Complaint,, filed by ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Dorn, Kevin)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting in part and deferring in part #12 Joint Motion to Amend Proposed Schedule. SCHEDULING ORDER: Administrative Record due by 12/15/2023. Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record due by 1/12/2024. Defendant's and defendant-intervenor's Responses to MJAR and Cross-Motions due by 2/2/2024. Plaintiff's Reply and Response due by 2/20/2024. Defendant's and defendant-intervenor's Replies due by 3/7/2024. Signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. (ts) Service on parties made.
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. (ts) Service on parties made.
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal #1 Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. (ts) Service on parties made.
December 6, 2023 Minute Entry - Was the proceeding sealed to the public? No. If Yes, only parties to the case may order a copy of the transcript. Proceeding held in Washington, D.C. 12/6/2023 before Senior Judge Loren A. Smith: Status Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official record of proceeding taken by court reporter. To order a certified transcript or an audio recording of the proceeding, click #HERE. (mp)
December 5, 2023 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Amend Schedule re: #5 Notice (Other), filed by ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC.Response due by 12/19/2023.(Dorn, Kevin)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/6/2023 at 05:00 PM EST in Chambers (Telephonic) before Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. Signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith. (ts) Service on parties made.
December 4, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Intervene , filed by ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC.Reply due by 12/11/2023. (Dorn, Kevin)
December 4, 2023 Filing 10 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement , filed by KROPP HOLDINGS, INC.. (Holman, Craig)
December 4, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Intervene , filed by KROPP HOLDINGS, INC..Response due by 12/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit 1-4, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Holman, Craig)
November 29, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John Hugh Roberson for USA . (Roberson, John)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (vds)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Random Assignment Pursuant to Rule 40.1(a) to Judge Loren A. Smith. (vds)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER, filed by ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC. Service: 11/29/2023.(vds)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Protective Order, filed by ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC. Service: 11/29/2023. Response due by 12/13/2023.(vds)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint, filed by ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC. Service: 11/29/2023. Response due by 12/13/2023.(vds)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 **SEALED**Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC. Service: 11/29/2023.(vds)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (DOD) (Filing fee $402, Receipt number AUSFCC-9182539) (Copy Served Electronically on Department of Justice), filed by ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC. Answer due by 1/29/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(vds)

Search for this case: ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATED ENERGY GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Todd John Canni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: John Hugh Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: KROPP HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Craig Alan Holman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?