Whitney Information, et al v. Xcentric Ventures, et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs Whitney Information Network, Inc. and Russ Whitney alleged that defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC, badbusinessbureau.org, and Ed Magedson (1) used plaintiffs' trademarks in commerce in a manner likely to cause consumer confusion and (2) published stories that are false about the plaintiffs with the intent to injure plaintiffs, their business reputation, and to illegally divert customers away from plaintiffs.

Plaintiff: Whitney Information Network, Inc.
Defendant: Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org and Ed Magedson
Case Number: 2:2004cv00047
Filed: January 27, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2008 Filing 196 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT for Costs by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Stack, Brian)
March 25, 2008 Filing 195 BILL OF COSTS taxed against Plaintiff in the amount of $3,966.58. Signed by Deputy Clerk. (drn)
March 14, 2008 Filing 194 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Itemization and documentation)(Speth, Maria)
March 10, 2008 Filing 193 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Itemization and documentation)(Speth, Maria)
March 10, 2008 Filing 192 FINAL Trademark Report sent to Washington. (kma)
February 25, 2008 Filing 191 JUDGMENT in favor of Badbusinessbureau.org, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson against Whitney Information Network, Inc. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (drn)
February 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 115 Motion for Summary Judgment and, Alternatively, Motion for Reconsideration Re: Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion for Sanctions. To the extent that Defendants seek summary judgment as to Plaintiff's defamation claim, the Motion is granted. To the extent that Defendants ask the Court to reconsider its prior rulings on personal jurisdiction, the Motion is denied. To the extent that the Defendants seek Rule 11 sanctions against Plaintiff, the Motion is denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff, close the file, and terminate any remaining motions and deadlines as moot.Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 2/15/2008. (NAB)
February 15, 2008 Filing 189 Emergency MOTION for Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
February 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDERED: The Court finds it necessary to cancel the final pretrial conference scheduled for February 19, 2008, at 10:30 a.m. This matter will be reset by notice on February 19, 2008. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 2/15/2008. (LAF)
February 14, 2008 Filing 187 NOTICE by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson Notice of Additional Defense Exhibit After Filing of Joint Pretrial Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 3.06(e), and Motion for Order Allowing Exhibit in Furtherance of Justice (Speth, Maria)
February 14, 2008 Filing 186 EXHIBIT LIST by Whitney Information Network, Inc... (Birken, Shawn)
February 12, 2008 Filing 185 REPLY to response to motion re 115 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Speth, Maria)
February 11, 2008 Filing 184 NOTICE by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson of Filing Proposed Verdict Form and Proposed Jury Instructions and Proposed Voir Dire (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Proposed Verdict Form, # 2 Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions, # 3 Defendants' Proposed Voir Dire)(Speth, Maria)
February 11, 2008 Filing 183 EXHIBIT LIST with objections by Whitney Information Network, Inc... (Birken, Shawn)
February 11, 2008 Filing 182 PROPOSED jury instructions by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's proposed verdict form, # 2 Plaintiff's proposed voir dire)(Birken, Shawn)
February 11, 2008 Filing 181 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE in opposition and Memorandum of Law re 168 Motion to supplement Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Motion to Supplement Record filed by Whitney Information Network, Inc. (Birken, Shawn) Modified on 2/12/2008 to correct docket text (drn).
February 6, 2008 Filing 180 Joint MOTION to extend time to file Proposed Jury Instructions, Exhibit Lists, Verdict Form and Voir Dire Questions by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Birken, Shawn)
February 6, 2008 Filing 179 PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Whitney Information Network, Inc., Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Birken, Shawn)
February 6, 2008 Filing 178 NOTICE of service of Defendants' Second Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson (Speth, Maria) Modified on 2/7/2008 to correct docket text (drn).
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 144 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief and Request for Oral Argument. To the extent that Defendants seek leave to file a reply, the Motion is granted. To the extent that Defendants request that this matter be set for oral argument, the Motion is denied without prejudice. Defendants shall file their reply, which shall not exceed 5 pages in length, and the affidavit of Dickson Woodward on or before February 12, 2008.Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 2/6/2008. (NAB)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting 173 the Stipulated Motion for Enlargement of Time. The parties shall have up to and including FEBRUARY 6, 2008 to submit the Joint Final Pretrial Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/6/2008. (LMH)
February 6, 2008 Filing 175 TRIAL BRIEF by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Speth, Maria)
February 5, 2008 Filing 174 MOTION to compel by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Speth, Maria) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell.
February 5, 2008 Filing 173 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Final Pretrial Statement by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Stack, Brian)
February 5, 2008 Filing 172 MOTION in limine regarding Alleged Defamatory Statements by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
February 5, 2008 Filing 171 MOTION in limine regarding deposition of Dixon Woodard by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Speth, Maria)
February 5, 2008 Filing 170 MOTION in limine regarding Other Lawsuits by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
January 30, 2008 Filing 169 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Final Pretrial Conference hearing previously scheduled for 02/19/08 is rescheduled. New scheduling TIME ONLY: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2008 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5 D before Judge Marcia Morales Howard (LAF)
January 28, 2008 Filing 168 MOTION to supplement Admit Newly Discovered Evidence in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A, # 2 Exhibit Exh B)(Speth, Maria)
January 18, 2008 Filing 167 NOTICE of supplemental authority re 115 MOTION for summary judgment by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson (Speth, Maria)
January 11, 2008 Filing 166 NOTICE by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson of Service of Defendants' First Supplemental Disclosure Statement (Speth, Maria)
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER denying 154 the Plaintiff Whitney Information Network, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/21/2007. (LMH)
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER denying 159 the Plaintiff, Whitney Information Network, Inc.'s Motion for Leave of Court to Conduct Additional Discovery and to Thereafter Supplement Its Response to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/20/2007. (LMH)
November 14, 2007 Filing 163 RESPONSE to motion re 154 MOTION for sanctions for Improper Deposition Conduct and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, 159 MOTION For Leave of Court to Conduct Additional Discovery and to Thereafter Supplement its Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Speth, Maria)
November 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 151 the Plaintiff Whitney Information Networks Inc.'s Motion to Strike or in the Alternatiive, Motion for Protective Order Regarding Untimely Served Discovery Requests. The Defendants discovery request propounded on September 26, 2007, is hereby stricken and the Plaintiff will not be required to respond to those specific discovery requests. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/6/2007. (lmh, )
November 5, 2007 Filing 161 RESPONSE in opposition re 154 MOTION for sanctions for Improper Deposition Conduct and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Speth, Maria)
November 3, 2007 Filing 160 RESPONSE in opposition re 151 MOTION to strike or in the alternative, Motion for Protective Order Regarding Untimely Served Discover Requests filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Speth, Maria)
October 31, 2007 Filing 159 MOTION For Leave of Court to Conduct Additional Discovery and to Thereafter Supplement its Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lippman, Steven)
October 31, 2007 Filing 158 SUPPLEMENT re 154 MOTION for sanctions for Improper Deposition Conduct and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lippman, Steven)
October 24, 2007 Filing 157 NOTICE by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson re 153 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) of Filing Eratta Sheet (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Speth, Maria)
October 22, 2007 Filing 156 STATUS REPORT by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Lippman, Steven)
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDERED: On or before November 8, 2007, the parties shall advise the Court as to the status of the mediation. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 10/22/2007. (laf, )
October 19, 2007 Filing 154 MOTION for sanctions for Improper Deposition Conduct and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Lippman, Steven)
October 19, 2007 Filing 153 NOTICE by Whitney Information Network, Inc. re 141 Memorandum in opposition, of Filing Deposition Transcript of Ed Magedson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Magedson Volume 1 pages 1 to 49# 2 Exhibit Deposition of Magedson Volume 1 pages 50 to 99# 3 Exhibit Deposition of Magedson Volume 1 pages 100 to 143# 4 Exhibit Deposition of Magedson Volume 2 pages 1 to 49# 5 Exhibit Deposition of Magedson Vol 2 pages 50 to 99# 6 Exhibit Deposition of Magedson Vol 2 pages 100 to 149# 7 Exhibit Deposition of Magedson Vol 2 pages 150 to 199# 8 Exhibit Deposition of Magedson Vol 2 pages 200 to 240# 9 Exhibit Deposition of Magedson Vol 2 pages 241 to 263# 10 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Magedson Deposition# 11 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Magedson Deposition# 12 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Magedson Deposition# 13 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Magedson Deposition# 14 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Magedson Deposition# 15 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Magedson Deposition# 16 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Magedson Deposition# 17 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Magedson Deposition# 18 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Magedson Deposition# 19 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Magedson Deposition# 20 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Magedson Deposition# 21 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Magedson Deposition# 22 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Magedson Deposition# 23 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to Magedson Deposition# 24 Exhibit Exhibit 15 to Magedson Deposition# 25 Exhibit Exhibit 16 to Magedson Deposition# 26 Exhibit Exhibit 17 to Magedson Deposition# 27 Exhibit Exhibit 18 to Magedson Deposition# 28 Exhibit Exhibit 19 to Magedson Deposition# 29 Exhibit Exhibit 20 to Magedson Deposition)(Birken, Shawn)
October 19, 2007 Filing 152 MEDIATION REPORT Hearing held on 9/20/07, continuing to 10/19/07 Hearing outcome: Impasse(Koch, Jonathan)
October 18, 2007 Filing 151 MOTION to strike or in the alternative, Motion for Protective Order Regarding Untimely Served Discover Requests by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Birken, Shawn)
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting 142the Plaintiff Whitney Information Network, Inc.'s Motion for leave to File Deposition Transcripts. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/10/2007. (lmh, )
October 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER denying as moot 119 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Clerk of the Court is directed to TERMINATE Plaintiffs Supplement to Motion for Additional Discovery Time Pursuant to Rule 56(f), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to Respond to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 139), as it was incorrectly filed as a motion. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 10/5/2007. (laf, )
October 1, 2007 Filing 148 NOTICE by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson Notice of Subpoena (Speth, Maria)
September 27, 2007 Filing 147 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 144 Motion for leave to file Reply Brief filed by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Birken, Shawn)
September 26, 2007 Filing 146 RESPONSE to motion re 142 MOTION for leave to file to File Deposition Transcripts filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
September 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting 143 the Unopposed Motion to Allow Telephonic Mediation. Maria Crimi Speth, as Counsel for the Defendants, Xcentric and Ed Magedson, as well as the Defendant, Mr. Magedson, shall have permission to appear via telephone for the scheduled mediation conference. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/19/2007. (lmh, )
September 14, 2007 Filing 144 MOTION for leave to file Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Summary Judgment and Request for Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
September 14, 2007 Filing 143 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically Motion to Allow Telephonic Mediation by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell.
September 10, 2007 Filing 142 MOTION for leave to file to File Deposition Transcripts by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Birken, Shawn)
September 10, 2007 Filing 141 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 115 Motion for summary judgment and, Alternatively, Motion for Reconsideration RE: Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion for Sanctions and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Deposition Excerpts for Woodard)(Birken, Shawn)
August 27, 2007 Filing 140 RESPONSE in opposition re 139 Supplemental MOTION to supplement Rule 56(f) Motion for Enlargement of Time to respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
August 22, 2007 Filing 139 Supplemental MOTION to supplement Rule 56(f) Motion for Enlargement of Time to respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Birken, Shawn)
August 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 137 the Plaintiff Whitney Information Network, Inc.'s Motion for Relief from or to Clarify Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/20/2007. (lmh, )
August 9, 2007 Filing 137 MOTION for reconsideration re 92 Order, 101 Order on motion for protective order, 135 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief or to Clarify Order by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Birken, Shawn)
August 3, 2007 Filing 136 NOTICE by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson Notice of Service of Disclosure (Speth, Maria)
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting 134 Oral Motion to Preclude Plaintiff's In-House Counsel from Deposition. Signed by Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 8/3/2007, nunc pro tunc, 8/1/07. (brh)
August 1, 2007 Filing 134 MOTION to preclude the plaintiff's in -house counsel from deposition by defendant Xcentric Ventures, LLC (kma)
August 1, 2007 Filing 133 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas N. Frazier: Telephone Conference held on 8/1/2007. This matter is referred from Judge Marcia Morales Howard as Judge Chappell was unavaible. Parties were attending a scheduled video deposition. Defendant presented an oral motion to preclude the plaintiff's in-house counsel from attending the deposition. Court grants the oral motion to preclude in-house counsel. Written order to follow. (kma, )
July 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 132 The Notice of Withdrawal of Motions to Compel and Supplment to Motion for Additional Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(f), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to Respond to Defenants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #130) is Granted. Accordingly, the Court hereby enters the ORDER denying as moot 124 the Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Sworn Answers to Second and Third Sets of Interrogatories, Better Answers to Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Request for Production, Supplement to Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 125 the Plaintiff's Reviewed Amended Motion to Compel Documents Responsive to First Request for Production, Additional Supplement to Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/26/2007. (lmh, )
July 25, 2007 Filing 131 RESPONSE in opposition re 119 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 115 MOTION for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56(f) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 115 MOTION for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56(f) filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Speth, Maria)
July 24, 2007 Filing 130 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Whitney Information Network, Inc. re 124 MOTION to compel Sworn Answers to Second and Third Sets of Interrogatories, Better Answers to Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Request for Production, Supplement to Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment and filed by Whitney Information Network, Inc., 125 Amended MOTION to compel Documents Responsive to First Request for Production and Additional Supplement to Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Whitney Information Network, Inc. (Birken, Shawn)
July 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 128 the Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Motions Pursuant to Rule 56(f) and Motions to Compel (Doc. #128) is GRANTED. The Defendants shall have up to and including JULY 25, 2007 to respond to the Plaintiff pending discovery motions. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/20/2007. (lmh, )
July 18, 2007 Filing 128 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 119 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 115 MOTION for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56(f) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 115 MOTION for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56(f), 124 MOTION to compel Sworn Answers to Second and Third Sets of Interrogatories, Better Answers to Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Request for Production, Supplement to Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment and, 125 Amended MOTION to compel Documents Responsive to First Request for Production and Additional Supplement to Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment by all defendants. (Speth, Maria)
July 12, 2007 Filing 127 NOTICE by Whitney Information Network, Inc. re 119 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 115 MOTION for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56(f) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 115 MOTION for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56(f) Notice of Compliance (Birken, Shawn)
July 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDERED: Plaintiff shall provide the Court with a certificate of compliance no later than July 13, 2007. In the event Defendants oppose the Motion, they shall file an appropriate response no later than July 18, 2007. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 7/10/2007. (laf, )
July 6, 2007 Filing 125 Amended MOTION to compel Documents Responsive to First Request for Production and Additional Supplement to Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Birken, Shawn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell.
July 3, 2007 Filing 124 MOTION to compel Sworn Answers to Second and Third Sets of Interrogatories, Better Answers to Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Request for Production, Supplement to Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Birken, Shawn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell.
July 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER denying 114 the Plaintiff Whitney Information Network, Inc.'s Amended Motion to Compel Responsive Documents to the First Request for Production. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/3/2007. (lmh, )
July 2, 2007 Filing 122 RESPONSE to motion re 114 Amended MOTION to compel Responsive Documents to First Request for Production filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting 120 the Notice of Removal of Counsel from Service List. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/27/2007. (lmh, )
June 26, 2007 Filing 120 NOTICE by Whitney Information Network, Inc. of Removal of Counsel from Service List (Lippman, Steven)
June 26, 2007 Filing 119 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 115 MOTION for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56(f) by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit In Support of Motion for Additional Discovery Time pursuant to Rule 56(f) to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment)(Birken, Shawn)
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER denying as moot 113 the Plaintiffs Whitney Information Network, Inc.s Motion to Compel Answers to Plaintiff's Second set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/25/2007. (lmh, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 117 SUMMARY JUDGMEMT NOTICE re 115 MOTION for summary judgment. (drn)
June 21, 2007 Filing 116 STATEMENT of undisputed facts re: 115 MOTION for summary judgment by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1# 3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2# 4 Exhibit 2 - Part 3# 5 Exhibit 2 - Part 4# 6 Exhibit 3# 7 Exhibit 4# 8 Exhibit 5# 9 Exhibit 6# 10 Exhibit 7# 11 Exhibit 8# 12 Exhibit 9# 13 Exhibit 10# 14 Exhibit 11# 15 Exhibit 12# 16 Exhibit 13)(Speth, Maria)
June 21, 2007 Filing 115 MOTION for summary judgment by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
June 15, 2007 Filing 114 Amended MOTION to compel Responsive Documents to First Request for Production by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit)(Birken, Shawn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell.
June 11, 2007 Filing 113 First MOTION to compel Documents Responsive to First Request for Production and Answers to Second Set of Interrogatories by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Birken, Shawn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell.
June 6, 2007 Filing 112 NOTICE by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson re Selection of Mediation Date (Speth, Maria)
June 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER denying 109 the Plaintiff Whitney Network, Inc.'s Motion to Expedite Answers to Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/1/2007. (lmh, )
May 31, 2007 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 109 Motion to expedite Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Answers to Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Speth, Maria)
May 18, 2007 Filing 109 MOTION to expedite Answers to Plaintiff's Third Set of Interrogatories by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Sackel, Matthew)
May 15, 2007 Filing 108 NOTICE by Whitney Information Network, Inc., Russ Whitney re 106 Order, OF SELECTION OF MEDIATOR (Birken, Shawn)
May 8, 2007 Filing 107 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 105 Case management and scheduling order by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Sackel, Matthew)
May 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER directing the parties to file a notice with the Court on or before May 23, 2007 indicating the name, address and telephone number of the mediator they selected and the date of the mediation. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 5/8/2007. (JLW)
April 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 105 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/16/2007. (LAG, )
April 2, 2007 Filing 104 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Pancier, Michael)
March 23, 2007 Filing 103 NOTICE re 89 Order to comply with electronic filing. Counsel, Jonathan P. Ibsen, has not complied and is therefore terminated and will not receive any further copies from the Court until registration is accomplished and a Notice of Appearance is electronically filed. (LAG, )
March 23, 2007 Filing 102 NOTICE re 89 Order to comply with electronic filing - counsel, Shawn L. Birken and Christopher C. Sharp, have complied. (LAG, )
March 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying 99 Motion for protective order. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/14/2007. (LAG, )
March 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER re 96 the District Court's Order directing the Parties to File a New Case Management Report. The Parties are directed to file a new Case Management Report by Monday April 2, 2007. The Parties may meet via telephonic conference to establish the new report. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/14/2007. (LAG, )
March 14, 2007 Filing 99 MOTION for protective order by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Stack, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell.
March 9, 2007 Filing 98 ANSWER to amended complaint by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson.(Stack, Brian)
March 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 94 the Unopposed Motion to Allow Shutts & Bowen LLP to Withdraw as Local Counsel for Defendants. Michael Gore, Esq., P.O. Box 4956, Orlando, Florida 32802-4956 and the law firm of Shutts & Bowen LLP, shall be relived of any further responsibility in this matter. Brian J. Stack, Esq., and Stack, Fernandez & Anderson, 1200 Brickell Avenue, Suite 950, Miami, Florida 33131-3255, shall be designated local Counsel. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/9/2007. (lmh, )
March 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting 77 Motion to continue; granting 79 Motion to continue (See order for details) Signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 3/9/2007. (drn)
March 9, 2007 AMENDED Case Reassignment. New case number: 2:04-cv-47-FtM-34-SPC. (drn)
March 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 90 the Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Scott W. Rothstein, Steven N. Lippman, and Shawn L. Birken, of the law firm Rothstein Rosenfelt Adler, 401 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 1650, Fort Lauderdale, Florida 33301, shall be designated Counsel of record. All further correspondence and pleadings shall be forwarded to their attention. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/8/2007. (lmh, )
March 7, 2007 Filing 94 Unopposed MOTION for MIchael Gore to withdraw as attorney (local counsel) by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson. (Gore, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell.
March 6, 2007 Filing 93 NOTICE OF HEARING: Video Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/07 at 10:30 A.M. EST (9:30 A.M. CST) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. Counsel shall appear at the Clerks Office on the Second Floor of the Fort Myers U.S. Courthouse & Federal Building at the allotted time.(LAG, )
March 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 92 PROTECTIVE ORDER OF CONFIDENTIALITY. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/6/2007. (lmh, )
March 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 86 the Defendants Xcentric Ventures, LLC. And Ed Magedson's Amended Motion for Protective Order and to Quash Subpoena. See order for details. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/6/2007. (lmh, )
March 5, 2007 Filing 90 MOTION to substitute attorney by all plaintiffs. (Lippman, Steven) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell.
March 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing. Signed by All Divisional District Judges on 3/5/2007. (Attachments: # 1)(LAG, )
March 2, 2007 Filing 88 RESPONSE in opposition re 86 Amended MOTION for protective order and to quash subpoena filed by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Pancier, Michael)
March 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting the Motion for Substitution of Counsel 85. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/1/2007. (lmh, )
February 28, 2007 Filing 86 Amended MOTION for protective order and to quash subpoena by Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Crockett, Denise) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell.
February 28, 2007 Filing 85 STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by Whitney Information Network, Inc., Russ Whitney. (Lippman, Steven)
February 27, 2007 Filing 84 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel byXcentric Ventures, LLC from 3/16/07, 3/30/07-4/6/07 to 5/1/07-5/4/07. (Stack, Brian)
February 27, 2007 Case reassigned to Judge Marcia Morales Howard but remains on Judge Magnuson's trial calendar unless otherwise ordered. New case number: 2:04-cv-47-MMH-SPC. Unassigned Judge no longer assigned to the case. (drn)
February 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 81 Motion for protective order to the limited extent that the due date on the subpoena is extended until Tuesday, March 6, 2007. The Defendant has up to and including Wednesday, February 28, 2007, to file a more complete objection to the subpoena. The Plaintiff has up to and including Friday, March 2, 2007, to file a reply. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/23/2007. (Chappell, Sheri)
February 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying 57 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 2/23/2007. (slu)
February 23, 2007 Filing 81 Emergency MOTION for protective order and to Quash Subpoena by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Stack, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell.
February 15, 2007 Filing 80 AMENDED TRIAL CALENDAR for April trial term. Jury Trial set for trial term beginning 4/2/2007 before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/15/2007. (drn)
February 12, 2007 Filing 79 Second MOTION to continue Pretrial Deadlines and Trial Pending Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Sackel, Matthew)
February 9, 2007 Filing 78 TRIAL CALENDAR for April trial term. Jury Trial set for trial term beginning 4/2/2007 at 09:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/8/2007. (slu) Modified on 2/9/2007 (slu).
February 2, 2007 Filing 77 MOTION to continue Pretrial Deadlines and Trial Pending Rules On Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Sackel, Matthew)
January 3, 2007 Filing 76 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Final Pretrial Conference hearing previously scheduled for March 26, 2007 before an unassigned judge is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2007 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A before Judge John E. Steele; Jury Trial set for term commencing 4/2/2007 Judge John E. Steele. (RKM)
November 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER vacating 69 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction and 70 Judgment. The Clerk shall reopen the case and reactivate 58 defendants' Motion to Dismiss, which shall be addressed in due course. The case is set for a March 26, 2007, pretrial conference before the unassigned judge and the trial term commencing April 2, 2007. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 11/13/2006. (RKM)
October 31, 2006 Case reassigned to Judge Unassigned Judge. New case number: 2:04-cv-47-FtM-99SPC. Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington no longer assigned to the case. (kma)
September 1, 2006 Filing 74 USCA judgment vacating the decision of the district court and remanding as to 72 Notice of appeal filed by Whitney Information Network, Inc. Entered on docket 08/01/06. USCA number: 06-11888. Issued as mandate: 08/01/06. (kma)
April 28, 2006 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE of readiness sent to USCA re: 72 Notice of appeal,. ROA consists of: volume of pleadings: 3 USCA number: 06-11888EE (kma)
March 20, 2006 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of certified copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re 72 Notice of appeal. (slu)
March 16, 2006 Filing 72 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 70 Judgment, 69 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number F007638. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order 69 # 2 Exhibit Judgment 70)(slu)
February 17, 2006 Filing 71 NOTICE of filing exhibit D to defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiffs' first amended complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson (refer to court file for exhibit) (slu)
February 16, 2006 Filing 70 JUDGMENT in favor of Xcentric Ventures, LLC and Badbusinessbureau.org and Ed Magedson against Whitney Information Network, Inc. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (slu)
February 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 58 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. This matter is dismissed with prejudice. The clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close the file. The clerk is further directed to terminate all previously scheduled deadlines and pending motions. See order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/15/2006. (agm)
February 13, 2006 Filing 68 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel byWhitney Information Network, Inc. from March 6-10; April 10; April 29-May 8. (Rosenfeldt, Stuart)
February 13, 2006 Filing 67 NOTICE of change of address by Stuart A. Rosenfeldt (Rosenfeldt, Stuart)
February 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 66 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 8/11/2006. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Jury Trial set for term commencing 10/2/2006 before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/6/2006. (laf)
February 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ENDORSED ORDER granting 64 Motion to Modify Case Management and Scheduling Order and to Extend Pretrial Deadlines and Trial. Plaintiff's request for a six month extension of the remaining pretrial deadlines, including the discovery deadline, and trial is granted. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/3/2006. (agm)
January 30, 2006 Filing 64 MOTION to modify Case Management and Scheduling Order and to Extend Pretrial Deadlines and Trial by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Rosenfeldt, Stuart)
November 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ENDORSED ORDER granting 61 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/22/2005. (agm)
November 22, 2005 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 57 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Rosenfeldt, Stuart)
November 18, 2005 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Dolin, Susan)
November 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ENDORSED ORDER granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/14/2005. (agm)
November 10, 2005 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Pancier, Michael)
October 21, 2005 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit E)(Stack, Brian)
October 21, 2005 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson. (Stack, Brian)
September 27, 2005 Filing 56 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Whitney Information Network, Inc..(Dolin, Susan)
August 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 54 the Plaintiff's Corrected Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Its Amended Complaint. The Plaintiff shall have up to and including SEPTEMBER 27, 2005 to file the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/24/2005. (lmh, )
August 22, 2005 Filing 54 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 1 Complaint by Whitney Information Network, Inc., Russ Whitney. (Kitterman, Christina)
August 17, 2005 Filing 53 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Whitney Information Network, Inc., Russ Whitney. (Kitterman, Christina) Modified on 8/18/2005 (slu). ERROR - incorrect attachment; Counsel notified; Motion terminated
August 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs' Motion 51 is DENIED as to Reconsideration of Order on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, and GRANTED as to Motion for Clarification of Order and Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Amended Complaint. The Court's Order 49 dismissing the case without prejudice provides the Plaintiffs with an opportunity to file an amended complaint. The Plaintiffs are hereby granted a TEN DAY extension of time from the date of this Order in which Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint. The Clerk is directed to reopen the file. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/3/2005. (mem)
July 28, 2005 Filing 51 First MOTION for reconsideration OF ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Whitney Information Network, Inc., Russ Whitney. (Kitterman, Christina) Modified on 7/29/2005 (slu).
July 18, 2005 Filing 50 JUDGMENT in favor of Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org and Ed Magedson against Whitney Information Network, Inc. and Russ Whitney (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (slu)
July 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting [26-2 and 27-1] Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss - Failure to State a Claim, denying 28 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. The Complaint 1 is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to all Defendants. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close the file. The Clerk is further directed to terminate all previously scheduled deadlines and pending motions. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/14/2005. (mem)
July 8, 2005 Filing 48 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Whitney Information Network, Inc., Russ Whitney from July 15, 2005 through August 1, 2005. (js)
June 14, 2005 Filing 47 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2006 09:30 AM before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. (laf)
April 27, 2005 Filing 46 NOTICE by Whitney Information Network, Inc., Russ Whitney of Selection of Mediator (Kitterman, Christina)
March 28, 2005 Filing 45 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Whitney Information Network, Inc., Russ Whitney from May 23, 2005 to May 25,2005 and June 16, 2005 to June 17, 2005 (js)
March 23, 2005 Filing fee received $ 10.00, receipt number F006261 (BJH, )
March 23, 2005 Filing fee received $ 10.00, receipt number F006262 (BJH, )
March 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 43 he Unopposed Motion of Maria Crimi Speth and Jonathan P. Ibsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/21/2005. (lmh, )
March 19, 2005 Filing 43 MOTION to appear pro hac vice by Michael L. Gore by on behalf of Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson. (Gore, Michael)
March 17, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/17/2005. (LAG, )
February 15, 2005 Filing 41 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Kitterman, Christina)
February 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Motion to substitute attorney. Added attorney Michael L. Gore for defendants. Attorney James A. Weinkle terminated . Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/4/2005. (LAG, )
February 4, 2005 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION to substitute attorney for Defendants by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson. (Gore, Michael)
February 4, 2005 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Gore on behalf of all defendants (Gore, Michael)
January 20, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 36 the Plaintiff?s First Motion for Permission to Conduct the Case Management Report Meeting Telephonically. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/20/2005. (lmh, )
January 18, 2005 Filing 36 First MOTION Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Permission to Conduct the Case Management Report Meeting Telephonically by Whitney Information Network, Inc., Russ Whitney. (Kitterman, Christina)
November 19, 2004 Filing 35 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC from 11/23/04 and 12/23/04 to 11/26/04 and 12/31/04. (Weinkle, James)
November 8, 2004 Filing 34 Re-NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Russ Whitney, Whitney Information Network, Inc. from 02/28/05 to 03/04/05. (js,)
November 1, 2004 Filing 33 NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Russ Whitney, Whitney Information Network, Inc. from 2-28-05 to 03-04-04. Attorney notified of incorrect date (js, )
October 27, 2004 Filing 32 RESPONSE in opposition re 28 First MOTION to strike 26 Second MOTION to dismiss the Complaint, 27 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Talarchyk, Tina)
October 26, 2004 Filing 31 NOTICE by Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC Substitution of Local Counsel (Talarchyk, Tina)
October 15, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 29 the Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendants' Second Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pending a Ruling by the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. The Plaintiff's shall have twenty (20) days from the date the Court rules on the pending Motion to Strike (Doc. #28). Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/14/2004. (lmh, )
October 13, 2004 Filing 29 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 26 Second MOTION to dismiss the Complaint, 27 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by Russ Whitney, Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Kitterman, Christina)
October 13, 2004 Filing 28 First MOTION to strike 26 Second MOTION to dismiss the Complaint, 27 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by Russ Whitney, Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Kitterman, Christina)
September 27, 2004 Filing 27 NOTICE by Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC re 26 Second MOTION to dismiss the Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Errata Corrected Second Motion to Dismiss-Failure to State A Claim With Supporting Memorandum of Law)(Weinkle, James)
September 21, 2004 Filing 26 Second MOTION to dismiss the Complaint by Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Weinkle, James) The .pdf image of the corrected motion entered as an attachment to 27 has been added on 7/7/2005 (kma).
September 20, 2004 Filing 25 Case reassigned to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Judge John E. Steele no longer assigned to the case. New case number: 2:04-cv-47-FTM-33SPC (LAG, )
September 8, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying 6 Motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/8/2004. (RKM)
August 26, 2004 Filing 23 REPLY to response to motion re 6 Motion to dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration Of Ed Magedson)(Weinkle, James)
August 17, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Badbusinessbureau.org. Defendants may file a Reply not to exceed five pages within ten days. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 8/17/2004. (RKM)
August 17, 2004 Filing 19 REPLY to response to motion re 6 Motion to dismiss Unopposed Motion For Leave to File Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition Response to Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Weinkle, James)
August 16, 2004 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Scott Durkin re: 18 Memorandum in opposition by Russ Whitney, Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (lap, )
August 16, 2004 Filing 21 NOTICE of filing affidavit of Scott Durkin by Russ Whitney, Whitney Information Network, Inc. re 18 Memorandum in opposition (lap, )
August 5, 2004 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 6 Motion to dismiss filed by Russ Whitney, Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 continuation of document)(lap, )
August 3, 2004 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed 6/8/04 to registered agent JohnGoodson filed by Russ Whitney, Whitney Information Network, Inc.. as to Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (jlh, )
July 30, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response on or before August 4, 2004. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 7/30/2004. (RKM)
July 30, 2004 Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Russ Whitney, Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Kitterman, Christina)
July 20, 2004 Filing 14 NOTICE by Badbusinessbureau.org, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC re 11 Order - Notice of Filing Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Weinkle, James)
July 16, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response. Plaintiffs shall file a response on or before July 30, 2004. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 7/16/2004. (RKM)
July 15, 2004 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Russ Whitney, Whitney Information Network, Inc.. (Kitterman, Christina)
July 1, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER ( Signed by Judge John E. Steele ) ctc (lap)
June 30, 2004 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Edward Magedson by Xcentric Ventures, Badbusinessbureau.or, Ed Magedson Re: [6-1] motion to dismiss complaint (lap)
June 30, 2004 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing affidavit of Ed Magedson by Xcentric Ventures, Badbusinessbureau.or, Ed Magedson (lap)
June 28, 2004 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 Disclosure statement by Xcentric Ventures, Badbusinessbureau.or (lap)
June 28, 2004 Filing 7 NOTICE of filing affidavit of Ed Magedson in support of motion to dismiss by Xcentric Ventures, Badbusinessbureau.or, Ed Magedson (lap) Modified on 07/02/2004
June 28, 2004 Filing 6 MOTION by Xcentric Ventures, Badbusinessbureau.or, Ed Magedson with memorandum in support to dismiss complaint (lap)
February 13, 2004 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Whitney Information, Russ Whitney Re: [2-1] order (lap)
February 13, 2004 Filing 4 NOTICE by Whitney Information, Russ Whitney of pendency of other actions re: order of compliance to local rule (lap)
January 30, 2004 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - TRACK 2. (ctc) (lap)
January 30, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER ( Signed by Judge John E. Steele ) ctc (lap)
January 27, 2004 SUMMONS(ES) issued for Xcentric Ventures, Badbusinessbureau.or, Ed Magedson. (sll)
January 27, 2004 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CASE ASSIGNMENT Magistrate assigned: Sheri Polster Chappell (sll)
January 27, 2004 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed; jury demand Filing fee $ 150.00 Receipt # F004807 (sll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitney Information, et al v. Xcentric Ventures, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Information Network, Inc.
Represented By: Scott W. Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xcentric Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Stack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badbusinessbureau.org
Represented By: Brian J. Stack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Magedson
Represented By: Brian J. Stack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?