Ferrarese v. Menu Foods, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Maria Teresa Ferrarese
Defendant: Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods, Inc. and Menu Foods Limited
Case Number: 2:2007cv00235
Filed: April 16, 2007
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Douglas N. Frazier
Presiding Judge: John E. Steele
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2007 25
MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: District of New Jersey (Newark) Transferee court case number: 2:07-cv-235-FtM-29DNF. MDL case number: MDL 1850. (drn)
September 12, 2007 24 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER directing the parties to notify the Court whether a further stay is required or if the case is due to proceed. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/12/2007. (RKM)
May 17, 2007 22 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 9 Motion to stay pursuant to the Stipulation insofar as the case is stayed for 90 days. The parties may seek leave to continue the stay if the case is not otherwise transferred. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 5/17/2007. (RKM)
May 15, 2007 9
MOTION to stay All Proceedings by all defendants. (McIntosh, Robert)
May 7, 2007 8 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 6 Motion For Pro Hac Vice Admission To Practice For Gary E. Mason. Signed by Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 5/7/2007. See Order for details. (bas)
April 27, 2007 6
MOTION for Gary E. Mason to appear pro hac vice by Maria Teresa Ferrarese. (Mason, Gary) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier.
April 26, 2007 5 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER directing counsel Gary E. Mason to be admitted and thereafter to comply with electronic filing. See order for details. Signed by Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 4/26/2007. (drn)
April 24, 2007 4 Opinion or Order of the Court
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/7/2007. Signed by Judge All Divisional Judges on 4/24/2007. (BJH, )
April 16, 2007 2
STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/27/07. (drn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrarese v. Menu Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Midwest Corporation
Represented By: Robert D. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund
Represented By: Robert D. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Limited
Represented By: Robert D. McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Teresa Ferrarese
Represented By: Scott Wm. Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?