Ezzo v. Google, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Jamil E. Ezzo
Defendant: Getmequotes.com, AOL.com, Plasticsurgery.org, Google, Inc., Time Warner, Inc., Yellowbookleads.com, American Society of Plastic Surgeons, Findyourplasticsurgeon.com, Ienhance.com and Doctorssayyes.com
Case Number: 2:2009cv00159
Filed: March 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Trademark Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Douglas N Frazier
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2010 Filing 82 INITIAL Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (kma)
July 15, 2010 Filing 81 JUDGMENT (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (SPB)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER dismissing case with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the file. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 7/14/2010. (RKR)
July 13, 2010 Filing 79 JOINT STIPULATION for Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice by Doctorssayyes.com. (Herbert, Gregory) Modified on 7/13/2010, to correct docket entry.(SPB)
March 1, 2010 Filing 78 NOTICE by AOL.com, Google, Inc., Time Warner, Inc. of Filing Certified Copy of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office File Wrapper (Attachments: #1 Certified copy of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office File Wrapper)(Lewis, Samuel)
February 22, 2010 Filing 77 ANSWER to second amended complaint #61 Amended complaint by Findyourplasticsurgeon.com.(SPB)
February 18, 2010 Filing 76 MOTION to dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Ienhance.com. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vitale, Michael)
February 15, 2010 Filing 75 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by American Society of Plastic Surgeons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Knape, Fred)
February 11, 2010 Filing 74 MOTION to dismiss Second Amended Complaint, MOTION for more definite statement by AOL.com, Google, Inc., Time Warner, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "1" - Supplemental Register Registration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "2" - USPTO Office Action)(Lewis, Samuel)
February 11, 2010 Filing 73 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Doctorssayyes.com. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Donoian, James)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying as moot #63 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #64 Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for More Definite Statement; denying as moot #65 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint; denying as moot #66 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; and, granting #68 Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk is directed to file the Second Amended Complaint separately. The Defendants shall have 21 days to file a response to the Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 1/28/2010. (brh)
January 15, 2010 Filing 71 NOTICE by Ienhance.com re #69 Response in opposition to motion, #70 Memorandum in opposition of Joinder (Vitale, Michael)
January 15, 2010 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #68 Motion for leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Google, Inc., AOL.com, Time Warner, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - USPTO Record for Serial Number 78-610,365)(Lewis, Samuel)
January 15, 2010 Filing 69 RESPONSE in opposition re #68 MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by American Society of Plastic Surgeons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Knape, Fred)
January 5, 2010 Filing 68 MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint by Jamil E. Ezzo. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(drn)
December 10, 2009 Filing 67 ANSWER to #61 Amended complaint by Findyourplasticsurgeon.com.(drn)
December 9, 2009 Filing 66 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by American Society of Plastic Surgeons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Knape, Fred)
December 9, 2009 Filing 65 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support by Ienhance.com. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vitale, Michael)
December 9, 2009 Filing 64 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint, MOTION for more definite statement by Google, Inc., AOL.com, Time Warner, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration on Supplemental Register, #2 Exhibit 2 - USPTO Office Action refusing registration on Principal Register)(Lewis, Samuel)
December 8, 2009 Filing 63 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Doctorssayyes.com. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Donoian, James)
December 8, 2009 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Vitale on behalf of Ienhance.com (Vitale, Michael)
November 18, 2009 Filing 61 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Yellowbookleads.com, Google, Inc., AOL.com, Time Warner, Inc., Getmequotes.com, Doctorssayyes.com, Findyourplasticsurgeon.com, Ienhance.com, Plasticsurgery.org terminating American Society of Plastic Surgeons filed by Jamil E. Ezzo.Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Jamil E. Ezzo.(drn)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; denying #38 Motion to Dismiss or in the alternative for More Definite Statement; denying #40 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; denying #41 Motion to Dismiss or in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement; and, denying #47 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. The Clerk is directed to file the First Amended Complaint separately. The Defendants shall have 21 days in which to file a response to the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 11/18/2009. (brh)
November 12, 2009 Filing 59 NOTICE by Ienhance.com re #57 Memorandum in opposition of Joinder (Durkin, Denis)
November 12, 2009 Filing 58 RESPONSE in opposition re #56 MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint filed by Doctorssayyes.com. (Herbert, Gregory)
November 9, 2009 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #56 Motion for leave to file filed by Google, Inc., AOL.com, Time Warner, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "1")(Lewis, Samuel)
October 27, 2009 Filing 56 MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint by Jamil E. Ezzo. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Amended Complaint)(drn)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying #51 Application for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Against Acquistion Sub, Inc., Findcosmeticsurgeons.com; denying #52 Application for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Against Findyourplasicsurgeon.com; and, denying #53 Application for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Against Yellow Book USA, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 10/13/2009. (brh)
September 25, 2009 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jamil E. Ezzo (kma)
September 25, 2009 Filing 53 MOTION for entry of default and MOTION for default judgment against Yellow Book USA, Inc. by Jamil E. Ezzo. (kma) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier.
September 25, 2009 Filing 52 MOTION for entry of default and MOTION for default judgment against Findyourplasticsurgeon.com by Jamil E. Ezzo. (kma) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier.
September 25, 2009 Filing 51 MOTION for entry of default and MOTION for default judgment against Acquisition Sub, Inc., Findyourplasticsurgeon.com by Jamil E. Ezzo. (kma) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier.
July 30, 2009 Filing 50 RETURN of service executed on 7/16/09 by Jamil E. Ezzo as to Yellowbookleads.com. (drn)
July 7, 2009 Filing 49 RETURN of service executed on 6/3/09 by Jamil E. Ezzo as to Getmequotes.com. (drn)
July 7, 2009 Remark : No further action will be taken re #43 as Mr. Donoian has complied. (LAG)
July 2, 2009 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ienhance.com. (Durkin, Denis)
July 2, 2009 Filing 47 MOTION to dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Ienhance.com. (Durkin, Denis)
June 24, 2009 Filing 46 PROOF of service by Jamil E. Ezzo re: Gregory J. Powers, Powers Acuisition, Inc., et al (named party defendant not indicated). (drn)
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James H. Donoian, Esquire. See Order for all details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 6/23/2009. (BAS)
June 19, 2009 Filing 44 Verified MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James H. Donoian, Esq. re #43 Order by Doctorssayyes.com. (Herbert, Gregory) (drn).
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER directing counsel James H. Donoian to be admitted and thereafter to comply with electronic filing. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 6/11/2009. (drn)
May 19, 2009 Filing 42 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to American Society of Plastic Surgeons. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/1/2009. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/19/2009. (drn)
May 18, 2009 Filing 41 MOTION to dismiss Complaint of Plaintiff Jamil E. Ezzo, and Alternative, MOTION for more definite statement and Memorandum of Law by American Society of Plastic Surgeons. (Knape, Fred)
May 15, 2009 Filing 40 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Doctorssayyes.com. (Herbert, Gregory)
May 13, 2009 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #33 Interested persons order by Time Warner, Inc.. (Lewis, Samuel)
May 13, 2009 Filing 38 MOTION to dismiss Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION for more definite statement by Google, Inc., AOL.com, Time Warner, Inc.. (Lewis, Samuel)
May 13, 2009 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed on 5/4/09 by Findyourplasticsurgeon.com as to Findyourplasticsurgeon.com. (drn)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER providing the pro se Plaintiff with information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 5/11/2009. (brh)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying #24 Motion to Join Party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 5/11/2009. (brh)
May 8, 2009 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Findyourplasticsurgeon.com.(drn)
May 8, 2009 Filing 33 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to Time Warner, Inc. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/19/2009. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/8/2009. (drn)
May 7, 2009 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed on 5/7/09 by Time Warner, Inc. as to Time Warner, Inc.. (Lewis, Samuel)
May 4, 2009 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #26 Interested persons order by Doctorssayyes.com. (Herbert, Gregory)
April 29, 2009 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #23 Interested persons order by Plasticsurgery.org. (Pollack, Woodrow)
April 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER granting #28 motion to appear pro hac vice of Fred Knape, Esquire. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 4/28/2009. (BAS)
April 27, 2009 Filing 28 MOTION for Fred Knape to appear pro hac vice by Plasticsurgery.org. (Colitz, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier.
April 20, 2009 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed on 04/20/2009 by AOL.com as to AOL.com. (Bombulie, James)
April 20, 2009 Filing 26 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to Doctorsayyes.com. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/1/2009. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/20/2009. (drn)
April 20, 2009 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed on 4/16/09 by Jamil E. Ezzo as to Doctorssayyes.com. (drn)
April 20, 2009 Filing 24 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to join party by Jamil E. Ezzo. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit, #(2) Exhibit A to Exhibit 1)(drn)
April 20, 2009 Filing 23 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to Plasticsurgery.org. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/1/2009. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/20/2009. (drn)
April 17, 2009 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed on 4/17/2009 by Plasticsurgery.org as to Plasticsurgery.org. (Colitz, Michael)
April 13, 2009 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #19 Interested persons order by Google, Inc.. (Lewis, Samuel)
April 9, 2009 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Findyourplasticsurgeon.com on 4/9/09 by Jamil E. Ezzo. (drn)
April 2, 2009 Filing 19 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to Google, Inc. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/13/2009. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/2/2009. (drn)
April 1, 2009 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Google, Inc. as to Google, Inc.. (Lewis, Samuel)
April 1, 2009 Filing 17 INITIAL Trademark Report sent to Washington. (kma)
March 31, 2009 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by AOL.com. (Bombulie, James)
March 31, 2009 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Jamil E. Ezzo. (drn)
March 31, 2009 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and notice of designation of track 2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jamil E. Ezzo. Related case(s): NO. (drn)
March 24, 2009 Filing 13 ADDENDUM TO ORIGINAL FILING for Case No: 2:09-cv-159-FtM-29DNF re Doc #1 (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A) (drn)
March 18, 2009 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Plasticsurgery.org on 3/18/09 by Jamil E. Ezzo. (drn)
March 18, 2009 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Google, Inc. on 3/18/09 by Jamil E. Ezzo. (drn)
March 18, 2009 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Time Warner, Inc. on 3/18/09 by Jamil E. Ezzo. (drn)
March 18, 2009 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to AOL.com on 3/18/09 by Jamil E. Ezzo. (drn)
March 18, 2009 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Doctorssayyes.com on 3/18/09 by Jamil E. Ezzo. (drn)
March 18, 2009 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Yellowbookleads.com on 3/18/09 by Jamil E. Ezzo. (drn)
March 18, 2009 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Getmequotes.com on 3/18/09 by Jamil E. Ezzo. (drn)
March 18, 2009 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Ienhance.com on 3/18/09 by Jamil E. Ezzo. (drn)
March 18, 2009 Summons issued as to Yellowbookleads.com. (drn)
March 18, 2009 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/30/2009. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/18/2009. (BJH)
March 18, 2009 Filing 3 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/30/2009. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/18/2009. (BJH)
March 18, 2009 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages.Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/20/08. (drn)
March 17, 2009 Summons issued as to Google, Inc., AOL.com, Time Warner, Inc., Getmequotes.com, Doctorssayyes.com, Findyourplasticsurgeon.com, Ienhance.com, Plasticsurgery.org. (drn)
March 17, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for United States registered trademark infringement, unfair business practices, violations of United States statutes, fraud on the inducement, and misrepresentatons to the plaintiff against Yellowbookleads.com, Google, Inc., AOL.com, Time Warner, Inc., Getmequotes.com, Doctorssayyes.com, Findyourplasticsurgeon.com, Ienhance.com, Plasticsurgery.org (Filing fee $350 receipt number F012150) filed by Jamil E. Ezzo.(drn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ezzo v. Google, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getmequotes.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AOL.com
Represented By: Samuel Abraham Lewis
Represented By: Samuel S. Heywood
Represented By: James Anthony Bombulie
Represented By: James M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plasticsurgery.org
Represented By: Stefan Vaughn Stein
Represented By: Fred Knape
Represented By: Woodrow Heath Pollack
Represented By: Michael John Colitz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Abraham Lewis
Represented By: Susan Joy Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Abraham Lewis
Represented By: Susan Joy Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellowbookleads.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Society of Plastic Surgeons
Represented By: Woodrow Heath Pollack
Represented By: Fred Knape
Represented By: Michael John Colitz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Findyourplasticsurgeon.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ienhance.com
Represented By: Denis L. Durkin
Represented By: Brandon Thomas Crossland
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctorssayyes.com
Represented By: James H. Donoian
Represented By: Gregory W. Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamil E. Ezzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?