Anderson v. City of Naples et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael Anderson |
Defendant: |
City of Naples, Naples Police Department and Ralph Anthony |
Case Number: |
2:2010cv00111 |
Filed: |
February 19, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Florida |
Office: |
Ft. Myers Office |
County: |
Collier |
Presiding Judge: |
Sheri Polster Chappell |
Presiding Judge: |
Charlene E. Honeywell |
Nature of Suit: |
P.I.: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1981 Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 20, 2010 |
Filing
72
ORDER denying 59 The Plaintiff Michael Anderson's Motion to Compel Defendant Ralph Anthony's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories; denying 60 The Plaintiff Michael Anderson's Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/20/2010. (LMH)
|
December 14, 2010 |
Filing
68
ORDER granting 63 Defendants' Motion to Compel and Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline as to Frantz Adeclat. The continued deposition of Frantz Adeclat shall take place at the Federal Courthouse, 2110 First Street, Fort Myers, Florida, 33901 on January 5, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. in a conference room adjacent to Courtroom 5D. Adeclat, counsel for Defendants, and a court reporter are required to attend. Failure to appear could result in sanctions. Plaintiff is required to provide the Court with an unredacted copy of the contract between himself and Adeclat for in camera review by December 29, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/14/2010. (LMH)
|
November 23, 2010 |
Filing
53
ORDER denying 50 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and for more Definite Statement for Failure to Follow Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/23/2010. (LMH)
|
November 22, 2010 |
Filing
51
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 Defendant's Motion to Compel. Defendant's Motion to Compel answers to interrogatory numbers 2, 10, 12, and 13 of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories is GRANTED. Plaintiff must full y and completely answer the above interrogatories by December 6, 2010. Defendant's Motion to Compel answers to production request number 1 of Defendant's First Request for Production is GRANTED. Plaintiff must fully and completely produce materials, documents, or information requested in the above mentioned request by December 6, 2010. Defendant's request for Attorney Fees and Additional Sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/22/2010. (LMH)
|
November 9, 2010 |
Filing
47
ORDER denying 45 Motion to compel; denying 46 Motion to stay discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/9/2010. (LMH)
|
October 27, 2010 |
Filing
43
ORDER denying 40 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Strike Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/27/2010. (LMH)
|
October 25, 2010 |
Filing
39
ORDER granting 35 Defendants Motion for Leave to File Amended Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and Separate Cross Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying as moot 26 Motion for summary judgment. Given that the Court has granted Defendant lea ve to file an amended Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, Defendants' first Cross Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #26) is DENIED AS MOOT. Pursuant to Local Rule 3.01(b), Plaintiff has 14 days from the date of service of Defendants' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment to file his opposition to the motion with the Court in a document not more than 20 pages in length. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/25/2010. (LMH)
|
October 20, 2010 |
Filing
34
ORDER denying without prejudice 30 Motion for leave to file; striking 31 Motion for summary judgment; denying 28 Motion to strike. Defendants shall have up to and including October 22, 2010 to refile their response to Plaintiffs motion for su mmary judgment and cross motion (Doc. #26) as two separate pleadings. Plaintiff shall have up to and including November 8, 2010 to refile his response to Defendants cross motion for summary judgment as a stand-alone pleading with no other requested relief. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/20/2010. (LMH)
|
March 26, 2010 |
Filing
9
ORDER granting 2 the Plaintiff Michael Andersons Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis.The Clerk is directed to file all pleadings in this cause without prepayment of costs, and the United States Marshal, upon receipt of appropriate in structions in proper form from the Plaintiff, is directed to effect service of process without prepayment of costs or fees. The Clerk is directed to provide Plaintiff with U.S. Marshal Forms 285. Plaintiff shall have TWENTY (20) DAYS from the date of this Order to prepare and forward the completed U.S. Marshal Form 285 to the Court for service by the United States Marshal Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/26/2010. (LMH)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?